This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Steven Garcia, et al v. Michael Bostic, et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Steven Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michael Bostic. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55392

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH BIELMA

FRANK URIARTE

GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ

ISAIAS NAVARRO

GERMAN DURAN

RUDY ALARCON

LUIS CASILLAS

STEPHEN FRAZIER

Defendants

DOES, 1-10

MARITZA HURTADO, individually and as an agent of the City

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEVEN GARCIA

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF CALEXICO, a public agency and/or municipal corporation

MICHAEL BOSTIC, individually and as Interim Chief of Police

RICHARD WARNE, individually and as Interim City Manager

GONZALO C. GERARDO, individually and as a Police Lieutenant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alvin Gomez

Attorney at Gomez Law Group

853 Camino Del Mar

Del Mar, CA 92014

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael T. Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs & Fuerst

600 B Street, Suite 2300

San Diego, CA 92101

Michael Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs & Fuerst

600 B Street, Suite 2300

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/29/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11263602] (CL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:28 AM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11280439] (CL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:30 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Steven Garcia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/10/2019. [11258718] [19-55392] (Gomez, Alvin) [Entered: 04/10/2019 08:31 AM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Michael Bostic, City of Calexico, Gonzalo C. Gerardo and Richard Warne Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/17/2019. [11266981] [19-55392] (Gibbs, Michael) [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • (#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellant Steven Garcia to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamline requests allow for 30 day extensions. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Steven Garcia opening brief due 07/05/2019. Appellees Michael Bostic, City of Calexico, Gonzalo C. Gerardo and Richard Warne answering brief due 08/05/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11315356] (DLM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Steven Garcia. New requested due date is 07/03/2019. [11314702] [19-55392] (Gomez, Alvin) [Entered: 05/31/2019 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11280439] (CL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • (#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11267097] (AD) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Michael Bostic, City of Calexico, Gonzalo C. Gerardo and Richard Warne Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/17/2019. [11266981] [19-55392] (Gibbs, Michael) [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/29/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11263602] (CL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11259392] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Steven Garcia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/10/2019. [11258718] [19-55392] (Gomez, Alvin) [Entered: 04/10/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/15/2019. Appellant Steven Garcia opening brief due 06/04/2019. Appellees Michael Bostic, City of Calexico, Gonzalo C. Gerardo and Richard Warne answering brief due 07/05/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11255962] (JBS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.