This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:08:22 (UTC).

Steven, et al v. Toyota Motor Sales USA

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Steven filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3257

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

HAROLD D. JOHNSON

MICHAEL E. STEVEN

Defendant / Appellees

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC.,, Lexus Division

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC., Lexus Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael T. Jilka

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Jilka

1040 New Hampshire

Lawrence, KS 66044

Mark G. Ayesh

Attorney at Ayesh Law Offices

8100 E. 22Nd Street North, Bldg. 2300, P.O. Box 781750

Wichita, KS 67278-1750

David Michael Hahn

Attorney at Ayesh Law Offices

8100 E. 22Nd Street North, Bldg. 2300, P.O. Box 781750

Wichita, KS 67278-1750

Mark Thomas Schoenhofer

Attorney at Law Office of Mark T. Schoenhofer

1631 East First Street

Wichita, KS 67214

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roger H. Stetson

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg

200 West Madison, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Caroline Hamilton Sear

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg

200 West Madison, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Shannon D. Wead

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

Alexandra N.C. Rose

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

Shannon Wead

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10711246] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 02/20/2020 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. [19-3257] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:37 AM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10701425] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Thomas Schoenhofer, Mr. Mark G. Ayesh and Mr. Michael T. Jilka for Michael E. Steven and Harold D. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document

[10701345] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/10/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on or before 01/21/2020 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:12 PM]

Open Document

[10701320] Notice received from Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

[10701288] Notice received from Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document

[10701129] Entry of appearance filed by Alexandra N.C. Rose and Ms. Shannon D. Wead for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:58 AM]

Open Document

[10700854] Docketing statement filed by Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/09/2019 12:17 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10711246] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 02/20/2020 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. [19-3257] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701608] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 12/27/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3257] [Entered: 12/11/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701425] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Thomas Schoenhofer, Mr. Mark G. Ayesh and Mr. Michael T. Jilka for Michael E. Steven and Harold D. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • [10701421] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark G. Ayesh, #10175; Mark T. Schoenhofer, #15781; Michael T. Jilka, #13677 for Appellants Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3257]--[Edited 12/11/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/11/19.] MGA [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701345] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/10/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on or before 01/21/2020 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701325] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/17/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSwi), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. Document to be refiled per counsel [DD] [10701322] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark G. Ayesh, #10175 for Appellants Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701320] Notice received from Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket as it was filed twice. [SLS] [10701319] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark G. Ayesh, #10175 for Appellants Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701290] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/17/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701288] Notice received from Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701129] Entry of appearance filed by Alexandra N.C. Rose and Ms. Shannon D. Wead for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3257] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701125] Entry of appearance submitted by Shannon D. Wead for Appellee Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 12/10/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 12/10/19][19-3257] SW [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10700854] Docketing statement filed by Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. Served on 12/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3257] MGA [Entered: 12/09/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698435] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/27/2019 Docketing statement due 12/11/2019 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. Transcript order form due 12/11/2019 for Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven. Notice of appearance due on 12/11/2019 for Harold D. Johnson, Michael E. Steven and Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., [19-3257] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.