This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:04:16 (UTC).

Steven Conway, et al v. Richard Heyl, et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Steven Conway filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Richard Heyl. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1512

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorcon LLC #4

Debtors

In re: Richard Michael Heyl

Jennifer Heyl

Defendant

Heyl Partners Station Plaza, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

Steven Conway

LorCon LLC #1

Defendant / Appellee

Richard Michael Heyl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jay Robert Burns Jr.

7777 Bonhomme Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert E. Eggmann

Attorney at CARMODY & MACDONALD

Suite 1800, 120 S. Central Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Appeal case docketed [4766276] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

Bankruptcy Appellate Panel document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/08/19, docket entries, Opinion 10/18/18, Opinion Letter 10/18/18, Letter To Publishing 10/18/18, Judgment 10/18/18, Order 2/07/19. [4766296] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/22/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Steven Conway due 04/22/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766336] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant LorCon LLC #1 and Not Party Lorcon LLC #4. - FOR CAL [4768523] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:23 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jay R. Burns, FBN 26235MO, 130 So. Bemiston Suite 300 Clayton MO 63105 (314) 726-1817 Email: jrburns@sbcglobal.net for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway, LorCon LLC #1 and Not Party Lorcon LLC #4 w/service 03/19/2019 [4768524] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Robert E. Eggmann for Appellee Mr. Richard Michael Heyl w/service 03/22/2019 [4769801] [19-1512] [4769801] [19-1512]--[Edited 03/25/2019 by HAG] To remove non-party Heyl Partners Station Plaza (REE) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document #1

Motion to Dismiss Appeal

Open Document #4

Exhibit C

Open Document #5

Exhibit D

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4785338-2 ] motion for extension of time to file rehearing filed by Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr.. Petition for Rehearing due on 05/13/2019 [4785435] [19-1512] (YML) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:22 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file petition for rehearing until 05/13/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 05/07/2019. [4785338] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document

REPLY to response [ # 4778444-2 ] filed by Appellee Mr. Richard Michael Heyl w/service 04/22/2019. [4780052] [19-1512] (REE) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4778452-2 ] motion to file response out of time is granted. Appellants' motion filed on April 16, 2019, is deemed timely filed. [4778803] [19-1512] (CMD) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion, [ # 4771114-2 ], until 04/16/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 04/16/2019. [4778452] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:58 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4771114-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 , w/service 04/16/2019. [4778444] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:50 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4777529-2 ] motion for extension of time to file a response filed by Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr.. Response to motion to dismiss now due on 04/15/2019. [4777648] [19-1512] (HAG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:50 AM]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4785338-2 ] motion for extension of time to file rehearing filed by Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr.. Petition for Rehearing due on 05/13/2019 [4785435] [19-1512] (YML) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file petition for rehearing until 05/13/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 05/07/2019. [4785338] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4771114-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Mr. Robert E. Eggmann. Case dismissed as untimely. BOBBY E. SHEPHERD, PASCO M. BOWMAN and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Apr 2019 [4780309] [19-1512] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY to response [ # 4778444-2 ] filed by Appellee Mr. Richard Michael Heyl w/service 04/22/2019. [4780052] [19-1512] (REE) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4778452-2 ] motion to file response out of time is granted. Appellants' motion filed on April 16, 2019, is deemed timely filed. [4778803] [19-1512] (CMD) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion, [ # 4771114-2 ], until 04/16/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 04/16/2019. [4778452] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4771114-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 , w/service 04/16/2019. [4778444] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4777529-2 ] motion for extension of time to file a response filed by Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr.. Response to motion to dismiss now due on 04/15/2019. [4777648] [19-1512] (HAG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss case, [ # 4771114-2 ], until 04/15/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 04/12/2019. [4777529] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4775399-2 ] motion for extension of time to file a response filed by Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr.. Response due on 04/12/2019. [4775462] [19-1512] (CMD) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss case, [ # 4771114-2 ], until 04/12/2019, And RESPONSE to motion to dismiss case , [ # 4771114-2 ], filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Robert Burns, Jr. for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway and LorCon LLC #1 w/service 04/08/2019. [4775399] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. Steven Conway, LorCon LLC #1 and Not Party Lorcon LLC #4. w/service 03/27/2019 [4771477] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending disposition of appellee's motion to dismiss. . [4771304] [19-1512] (CMD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Robert E. Eggmann for Appellee Mr. Richard Michael Heyl w/service 03/27/2019. [4771114] [19-1512] (REE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Robert E. Eggmann for Appellee Mr. Richard Michael Heyl w/service 03/22/2019 [4769801] [19-1512] [4769801] [19-1512]--[Edited 03/25/2019 by HAG] To remove non-party Heyl Partners Station Plaza (REE) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jay R. Burns, FBN 26235MO, 130 So. Bemiston Suite 300 Clayton MO 63105 (314) 726-1817 Email: jrburns@sbcglobal.net for Appellants Mr. Steven Conway, LorCon LLC #1 and Not Party Lorcon LLC #4 w/service 03/19/2019 [4768524] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant LorCon LLC #1 and Not Party Lorcon LLC #4. - FOR CAL [4768523] [19-1512] (JRB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/22/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Steven Conway due 04/22/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766336] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Bankruptcy Appellate Panel document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/08/19, docket entries, Opinion 10/18/18, Opinion Letter 10/18/18, Letter To Publishing 10/18/18, Judgment 10/18/18, Order 2/07/19. [4766296] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Appeal case docketed [4766276] [19-1512] (TMF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.