This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:10 (UTC).

Steven Braunstein v. Charles Daniels, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Steven Braunstein filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Charles Daniels. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15201

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

JAMES COX

ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF NEVADA

CHARLES DANIELS

Petitioner / Appellant

STEVEN BRAUNSTEIN

Indian Springs, NV 89070-0650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Victor-Hugo Schulze Esquire II

Attorney at AGNV - OFFICE OF THE NEVADA ATTORNEY GENERAL (LAS VEGAS)

555 East Washington Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Heather D. Procter

Attorney at AGNV - Nevada Office of the Attorney General

100 North Carson Street

Carson City, NV 89701

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Steven Braunstein

Attorney at HDSP - HIGH DESERT STATE PRISON (INDIAN SPRINGS)

P.O. Box 650

Indian Springs, NV 89070-0650

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Attorney General for the State of Nevada and James Cox Correspondence: Charles Daniels should be substituted as the named respondents. Date of service: 02/27/2020 [11610563] [20-15201] (Procter, Heather) [Entered: 02/27/2020 08:25 AM]

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 2/14/20 [11601637] (CW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:42 AM]

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) Appellee James Cox in 20-15201 substituted by Appellee Charles Daniels in 20-15201 [11610621] (CW) [Entered: 02/27/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Attorney General for the State of Nevada and James Cox Correspondence: Charles Daniels should be substituted as the named respondents. Date of service: 02/27/2020 [11610563] [20-15201] (Procter, Heather) [Entered: 02/27/2020 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Victor-Hugo Schulze II substituted by Attorney Heather D. Procter in 20-15201. [11608743] (HH) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of HEATHER D. PROCTER (Office of the Attorney General 100 N. Carson St. Carson City, NV 89701) for Appellees Attorney General for the State of Nevada and James Cox. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Victor-Hugo Schulze, II, Esquire for Appellees Attorney General for the State of Nevada and James Cox. Date of service: 02/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11608370] [20-15201] (Procter, Heather) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 2/14/20 [11601637] (CW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 01/23/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11594271] (JMR) [Entered: 02/12/2020 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.