This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:37 (UTC).

Steve Wentz v. Project Veritas, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Steve Wentz filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Project Veritas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12671

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEVE WENTZ

Defendant / Appellees

ALLISON MAASS

JAMES O'KEEFE, III

PROJECT VERITAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Cynthia Ariel Conlin

Attorney at Cynthia Conlin, PA

1643 Hillcrest St

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David S. Oliver

280 New Gate Loop

Lake Mary, FL 32746

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Steve Wentz. Motion is Unopposed. [8855610-1] [19-12671] (ECF: Cynthia Conlin) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Steve Wentz's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:49 PM]

Open Document #4

DC Order #150

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

Judgment in a Civil Case DC #151

Open Document

Attorney Cynthia Ariel Conlin for Appellant Steve Wentz has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:02 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Steve Wentz's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Steve Wentz is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8855610-2 ] [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Steve Wentz. Motion is Unopposed. [8855610-1] [19-12671] (ECF: Cynthia Conlin) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David S. Oliver for Project Veritas, James O'Keefe, III and Allison Maass. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Cynthia Ariel Conlin for Steve Wentz. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Cynthia Ariel Conlin for Appellant Steve Wentz has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Cynthia Ariel Conlin for Steve Wentz. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Steve Wentz on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Steve Wentz. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Project Veritas [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.