This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

Sterling National Bank v. Bernard Block, et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Sterling National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bernard Block. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2300

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

STERLING NATIONAL BANK

Defendant / Appellees

BERNARD N. BLOCK, Trustee

REBECCA R. TRAYBER

RITA BLOCK

ALVIN BLOCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paula Enid Litt

Attorney at HONIGMAN LLP

155 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4617

Dennis Abdelnour

Attorney at HONIGMAN LLP

155 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4617

Peter C. Harvey

Attorney at PATTERSON, BELKNAP, WEBB & TYLER LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bruce N. Menkes

Attorney at MANDELL MENKES, LLC

One N. Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

George Desh

Attorney at MANDELL MENKES, LLC

One N. Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filed Reply by Appellant Sterling National Bank to to Appellees' Memorandum. [11][7026064] [19-2300] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:07 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: On consideration of appellees responsive memorandum filed on 08/12/2019, Appellant, on or before 08/26/2019, may file a reply to appellees memorandum, if it chooses to do so. Appellant is reminded that a motion to dismiss the appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy its obligation to respond. DW [10] [7023266] [19-2300] (MM) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:17 AM]

#9

(#9) Filed Response by Appellees Alvin Block, Bernard N. Block, Rita Block and Rebecca R. Trayber to Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. [9][7023028] [19-2300] (Menkes, Bruce) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:40 PM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney George V. Desh for Appellees Alvin Block, Bernard N. Block, Rita Block and Rebecca R. Trayber. [8] [7023012] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2300] --[Edited 08/12/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Desh, George) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:24 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing shall continue to be SUSPENDED pending further court order. [7] JB [7021255] [19-2300] (AG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:58 AM]

#6

(#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [6] [7021253] [19-2300] (AG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:56 AM]

#5

(#5) ORDER re: Sterling National Banks Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on July 31, 2019. Appellees shall file, on or before August 12, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of July 17, 2019. DW [5] [7021109] [19-2300] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:12 PM]

#4

(#4) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Sterling National Bank. [4] [7020921] [19-2300] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 07/31/2019 05:28 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Appellant Sterling National Bank shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7017856] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Sterling National Bank by 07/31/2019. [3] [7017856] [19-2300] (FP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:21 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Dennis J. Abdelnour for Appellant Sterling National Bank. [2] [7016947] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2300]--[Edited 07/12/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Abdelnour is added to the docket.] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:40 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed Reply by Appellant Sterling National Bank to to Appellees' Memorandum. [11][7026064] [19-2300] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: On consideration of appellees responsive memorandum filed on 08/12/2019, Appellant, on or before 08/26/2019, may file a reply to appellees memorandum, if it chooses to do so. Appellant is reminded that a motion to dismiss the appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy its obligation to respond. DW [10] [7023266] [19-2300] (MM) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed Response by Appellees Alvin Block, Bernard N. Block, Rita Block and Rebecca R. Trayber to Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. [9][7023028] [19-2300] (Menkes, Bruce) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney George V. Desh for Appellees Alvin Block, Bernard N. Block, Rita Block and Rebecca R. Trayber. [8] [7023012] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2300] --[Edited 08/12/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Desh, George) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing shall continue to be SUSPENDED pending further court order. [7] JB [7021255] [19-2300] (AG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [6] [7021253] [19-2300] (AG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re: Sterling National Banks Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on July 31, 2019. Appellees shall file, on or before August 12, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of July 17, 2019. DW [5] [7021109] [19-2300] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Sterling National Bank. [4] [7020921] [19-2300] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 07/31/2019 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Appellant Sterling National Bank shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7017856] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Sterling National Bank by 07/31/2019. [3] [7017856] [19-2300] (FP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Dennis J. Abdelnour for Appellant Sterling National Bank. [2] [7016947] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2300]--[Edited 07/12/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Abdelnour is added to the docket.] (Abdelnour, Dennis) [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/24/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/19/2019 for Sterling National Bank. [1] [7016721] [19-2300] (FP) [Entered: 07/11/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.