This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/08/2021 at 06:25:03 (UTC).

Stephen Papierz v. Benteler Automotive Corp

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Stephen Papierz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Benteler Automotive Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1237

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHEN PAPIERZ, an individual

Defendant / Appellee

BENTELER AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION, a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Frank Piper II

Attorney at Law Office

1611 W. Centre Avenue, Suite 209

Portage, MI 49024

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christina K. McDonald

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

200 Ottawa Avenue, N.W., Suite 1000

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Phillip J. DeRosier

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

Angelina Rose Delmastro

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/01/2021. appellee brief now due 08/02/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:24 PM]

#14

(#14) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled as a preliminary status conference for 04/12/2021 at 4:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg and Counsel ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] [21-1237, 21-1238] (LMR) [Entered: 04/09/2021 02:29 PM]

#13

(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/26/2021. appellee brief now due 05/26/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:34 AM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Christina K. McDonald. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1237] (CKM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:42 PM]

#11

(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William Frank Piper, II for Appellant Stephen Papierz.. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/12/2021 10:14 AM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William Frank Piper, II for Appellant Stephen Papierz Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:01 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Papierz by William F Piper. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:00 AM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (PJD) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:21 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Angelina R. Delmastro. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (ARI) [Entered: 03/11/2021 09:42 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (PJD) [Entered: 03/11/2021 08:41 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg in CA Nos. 21-1231, 21-1237 and 21-1238. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-1231, 21-1237, 21-1238] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:40 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/19/2021;. appellee brief due 05/19/2021; (CAM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:54 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Papierz. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:51 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#16) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/01/2021. appellee brief now due 08/02/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled as a preliminary status conference for 04/12/2021 at 4:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg and Counsel ONLY. [Please open notice for important details.] [21-1237, 21-1238] (LMR) [Entered: 04/09/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/26/2021. appellee brief now due 05/26/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Christina K. McDonald. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1237] (CKM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William Frank Piper, II for Appellant Stephen Papierz.. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/12/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William Frank Piper, II for Appellant Stephen Papierz Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Papierz by William F Piper. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (WFP) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (PJD) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Angelina R. Delmastro. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (ARI) [Entered: 03/11/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Benteler Automotive Corporation by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [21-1237] (PJD) [Entered: 03/11/2021 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg in CA Nos. 21-1231, 21-1237 and 21-1238. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-1231, 21-1237, 21-1238] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/19/2021;. appellee brief due 05/19/2021; (CAM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Papierz. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benteler Automotive Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Kay McDonald