This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/08/2022 at 08:38:31 (UTC).

Stephen Malloy v. City of San Francisco, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Stephen Malloy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of San Francisco,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16806

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHEN MALLOY

San Francisco, CA 94117

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

MARY-ANN HARISTON

CHRIS HARRINGTON

JANET NAPOLITANO

GEORGE KIEFFER

CHARLES ROBINSON

GRETA SCHNETZLER

COREY JACKSON

JOHN STUBBO

SUSAN TAYLOR

GRANT ABERNATHY

DENISE CARAMAGNO

ALAN CARPENTER

JANE CZECH

BARBARA FRENCH

BRENDA GEE

VALERIE GRUBER

SAM HAWGOOD

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen Malloy

562 Belvedere Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons

Attorney at Gordon Rees, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

3 #1

Fee Due OSC

3 #2

Main Document

#3

Additional Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12598595] (CKP) [Entered: 11/30/2022 07:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 22-16806: Due] ). [12598594] (CKP) [Entered: 11/30/2022 07:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Stephen Malloy opening brief due 01/23/2023. Appellees Grant Abernathy, Hallie Albert, Kavoos Bassiri, Breed, Jeanne Buick, Robyn Burke, Micki Callahan, Denise Caramagno, Alan Carpenter, City of San Francisco, Grant Colfax, Roxana Costello, Jane Czech, Kelly Eagen, Barbara French, Susan Gard, Brenda Gee, Valerie Gruber, Hali Hammer, Mary-Ann Hariston, Chris Harrington, Sam Hawgood, Herrera, Hobin-Porter, Kate Howard, Corey Jackson, Megan Kennel, George Kieffer, Jeremy Lane, Dan Lowenstein, Susanna Luong, Christina Mangurian, John McQuaid, Kate Mente, Fumi Mitsuihi, Alice Moughamian, Janet Napolitano, Renee Navaroo, Deborah Ohiomoba, Shelly Patton, Susan Penny, Michelle Pero, Regents of the University of California, Constance Revore, Anna Robert, Charles Robinson, Aviva Roller, Maggie Rykowski, Nyoki Sacramento, Andrea Sanchez, Greta Schnetzler, Rhonda Simmons, Linda Simon, Matthew State, Stoughton, John Stubbo, Susan Taylor, Thoren, Mawuli Tugbenyoh, Veronica Vien, Henry Voong, Greg Wagner, Ron Weigelt, Zachary Williams and Jonathon Yank answering brief due 02/23/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12595078] (RT) [Entered: 11/23/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alan Carpenter is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons(Designation Retained)