This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2019 at 06:29:40 (UTC).

Stephen Chamberlain v. Samuel Brown

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Stephen Chamberlain filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samuel Brown. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1246

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SAMUEL BROWN

MARIETTA B. WARREN

JUDITH C. CHAMBERLAIN

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHEN D. CHAMBERLAIN

Castle Pines, CO 80108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

M. Olivia Haarz

Attorney at ECCLESTON & WOLF, PC

7240 Parkway Drive

Hanover, MD 21076

Alvin Frederick

Attorney at ECCLESTON & WOLF, PC

7240 Parkway Drive

Hanover, MD 21076

Thomas Johns Whiteford Esq.

Attorney at WHITEFORD, TAYLOR & PRESTON, LLP

7 St. Paul Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-1626

Patrick Dugan McKevitt

Attorney at WHITEFORD, TAYLOR & PRESTON, LLP

7 St. Paul Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-1626

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen D. Chamberlain

7325 Shoreham Place

Castle Pines, CO 80108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Stephen D. Chamberlain. [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:42 PM]

9 #2

form(s) sent

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stephen Chamberlain. Informal Opening Brief due 04/01/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:03 PM]

9 #1

Docketing forms follow up notice

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Judith C. Chamberlain. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000483774] [19-1246] Patrick McKevitt [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:09 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick D. McKevitt for Judith C. Chamberlain. [1000471311] [19-1246] Patrick McKevitt [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:26 PM]

#16

(#16) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Stephen D. Chamberlain. [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:06 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Stephen D. Chamberlain for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 03/10/2019 US mail. [1000474305] [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:14 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02880-GLR. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:49 AM]

10 #1

Disclosure of corporate affiliations

#15

(#15) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Samuel Brown, Judith C. Chamberlain and Marietta B. Warren. [19-1246] Alvin Frederick [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:39 PM]

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/20/2019. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:05 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed [1000474448] granting appellant's motion for leave to file electronically. [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1246] SAC [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:31 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alvin I. Frederick for Samuel Brown and Marietta B. Warren. [1000471870] [19-1246] Alvin Frederick [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:42 AM]

#14

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stephen D. Chamberlain. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000476280] [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:49 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Stephen D. Chamberlain. [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Samuel Brown, Judith C. Chamberlain and Marietta B. Warren. [19-1246] Alvin Frederick [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Stephen D. Chamberlain. [19-1246]--[Edited 04/03/2019 by JHM - document duplicate of what was filed electronically] JHM [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#13) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02880-GLR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1246] TW [Entered: 03/29/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Stephen D. Chamberlain. [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Judith C. Chamberlain. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000483774] [19-1246] Patrick McKevitt [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Samuel Brown and Marietta B. Warren. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000483355] [19-1246] Alvin Frederick [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Stephen D. Chamberlain and Samuel Brown, Judith C. Chamberlain and Marietta B. Warren re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Samuel Brown, Judith C. Chamberlain, Stephen D. Chamberlain and Marietta B. Warren on 04/01/2019.. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stephen D. Chamberlain. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000476280] [19-1246] Stephen Chamberlain [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed [1000474448] granting appellant's motion for leave to file electronically. [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1246] SAC [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Stephen D. Chamberlain for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 03/10/2019 US mail. [1000474305] [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alvin I. Frederick for Samuel Brown and Marietta B. Warren. [1000471870] [19-1246] Alvin Frederick [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick D. McKevitt for Judith C. Chamberlain. [1000471311] [19-1246] Patrick McKevitt [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/20/2019. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stephen Chamberlain. Informal Opening Brief due 04/01/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02880-GLR. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.