This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:06:43 (UTC).

Stephanie Jones v. Jeremy Eder, et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Stephanie Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jeremy Eder. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20223

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FORT BEND COUNTY

JEREMY EDER, in his individual capacity

B. BAKER, in his individual capacity

R. NG, in his individual capacity

J. DALE, in his individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHANIE JONES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II

Attorney at County Attorney's Office

401 Jackson Street

Richmond, TX 77469

Justin Carl Pfeiffer

Attorney at County Attorney's Office

401 Jackson Street

Richmond, TX 77469

Norman Ray Giles

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

William S. Helfand

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Pieratt Demond

Attorney at Demond & Hassan, P.L.L.C.

1520 Rutland Street

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Norman Ray Giles for Mr. Jeremy Eder and Mr. R. Ng for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20223] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:01 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9027769-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20223] (CAV) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (Justin Carl Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:45 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (Justin Carl Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:02 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2019 for Appellant Stephanie Jones. [19-20223] (ABT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (William Pieratt Demond ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 07:38 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Stephanine Jones [19-20223] (CAV) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo, II for Mr. B. Baker, Mr. J. Dale and Fort Bend County for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20223] (Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:41 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Ms. Stephanie Jones in 19-20223 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-20223] (MAS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 06/13/2019 for Appellant Stephanie Jones. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/04/2019 for Appellant Stephanie Jones.. Appellee's Brief due on 06/24/2019 for Appellees B. Baker, J. Dale, Jeremy Eder, Fort Bend County and R. Ng [19-20223] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Stephanie Jones. Date of service: 05/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Demond; Attorney for Appellees: Giles, Helfand, LoPiccolo, Pfeiffer [19-20223] (William Pieratt Demond ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Pieratt Demond for Appellant Stephanie Jones in 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (William Pieratt Demond ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 07:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2019 for Appellant Stephanie Jones. [19-20223] (ABT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20223] (ABT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William S. Helfand for party(s) Appellee R. Ng Appellee Jeremy Eder, in case 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Norman Ray Giles for Appellee R. Ng in 19-20223, Attorney Norman Ray Giles for Appellee Jeremy Eder in 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Norman Ray Giles for Mr. Jeremy Eder and Mr. R. Ng for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20223] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II for Appellee Fort Bend County in 19-20223, Attorney Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II for Appellee B. Baker in 19-20223, Attorney Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II for Appellee J. Dale in 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Justin Carl Pfeiffer for party(s) Appellee B. Baker Appellee J. Dale, in case 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo, II for Mr. B. Baker, Mr. J. Dale and Fort Bend County for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20223] (Salvatore Philip LoPiccolo II) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (Justin Carl Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Justin Carl Pfeiffer for party(s) Appellee Fort Bend County, in case 19-20223 [19-20223] (CAS) [Entered: 04/15/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20223] (Justin Carl Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:15-CV-2919. Electronic ROA due on 04/26/2019. [19-20223] (CAV) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9027769-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20223] (CAV) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Stephanine Jones [19-20223] (CAV) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.