This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/23/2021 at 06:14:23 (UTC).

Stephanie Crum, et al v. American Medical Systems, Inco

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Stephanie Crum filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inco. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1322

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellants

GLEN CRUM

STEPHANIE CRUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aaron D. Grant

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER, LLP

501 Indiana Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46202-6150

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-0000

Kim M. Watterson

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

Stephen J. McConnell

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dennis A. Costigan

Attorney at MOTLEY & RICE LLC

55 Cedar Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant is directed to make an electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 05/24/2021. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. JNS [7152884] [21-1322] (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Aaron D. Grant for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [14] [7151604] [21-1322] (LJ) [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Dennis A. Costigan for Appellants Stephanie Crum and Glen Crum has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [13] [7151602] [21-1322] (LJ) [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Barbara R. Binis for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [12] [7151557] [21-1322] (LJ) [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Stephanie Crum and Glen Crum. [11] [7146546] [21-1322] (Costigan, Dennis) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Barbara R. Binis for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated. [10] [7146025] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1322] (Binis, Barbara) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information noted in the order, in addition to all the information that Circuit Rule 28(a)(2) requires concerning appellate jurisdiction (which is absent from appellants March 2, 2021 filing). The statement is due on or before March 10, 2021. (See order for further details) DW [9] [7145144] [21-1322] (AG) [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen J. McConnell for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated. [8] [7144968] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1322][Edited 03/03/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (McConnell, Stephen) [Entered: 03/03/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Barbara R. Binis for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated. [7] [7144948] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1322] (Binis, Barbara) [Entered: 03/03/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellants Glen Crum and Stephanie Crum. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7144923] [21-1322] (Costigan, Dennis) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kim M. Watterson for Appellee American Medical Systems, Incorporated. [5] [7144833] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1322] --[Edited 03/02/2021 by ER - added Attorney Kim M. Watterson] (Watterson, Kim) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 04/12/2021 for Glen Crum and Stephanie Crum. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/12/2021 for American Medical Systems, Incorporated. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/02/2021 for Appellants Glen Crum and Stephanie Crum. JNS [7144132] [21-1322] (CG) [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday March 11, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [3] [7144130] [21-1322] (CG) [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: In the present case, plaintiffs rely on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction. However, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the state(s) of citizenship of all parties. Appellants must provide this information. It is insufficient to cite 28 U.S.C. 1332. Accordingly, appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before 03/02/2021. DW [2] [2] [7143269] [21-1322] (MM) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/08/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/05/2021 for Glen Crum and Stephanie Crum. [1] [7143180] [21-1322] (FP) [Entered: 02/23/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis A. Costigan