This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2021 at 06:51:34 (UTC).

Stephanie Carlson v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 Stephanie Carlson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-1220

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHANIE S. CARLSON

Evansville, IN 47715

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

M. Scott McIntyre

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

312 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4074

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephanie S. Carlson

1906 Eastland Drive

Evansville, IN 47715

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER re: Motion to Refund Plaintiff/ Appellants' Costs and Fees. [ # 27 ] The motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in the district court. This court does not collect or return docketing fees. SCR [28] [6851383] [17-1220] (MM) [Entered: 06/30/2017 09:48 AM]

#27

(#27) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson to refund costs and fees paid for appeal 17-1220 as the district court erred and not the appellant. [27] [6850891] [17-1220] (MM) [Entered: 06/28/2017 03:34 PM]

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

#26

(#26) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [26] [6845930] [17-1220] (AP) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:37 AM]

#25

(#25) ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED due to the lack of a final, appealable order. William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge. [25] [6841207] [17-1220] (AP) [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:19 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: On February 7, 2017, the district court issued a Notice of Clerical Error, in which it explained that it made an error in its January 18, 2017, order and would correct that error if this court granted it leave to do so. In light of the district court's statement that it is inclined to amend its January 18 order, these appeals are REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with its notice dated February 7, 2017. See Fed. R. App. P. 12.1; Cir. R. 57. This court will retain jurisdiction and counsel for the appellee shall file a status report with this court within seven days of the district court correcting its order. SCR [6] [6819402] [17-1220, 17-1222] (FP) [Entered: 02/16/2017 12:46 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: The court, on its own initiative, amends the order that it issued on February 3, 2017, to reflect that appellants memorandum is due on or before February 15, 2017. Appellant shall file, on or before February 15, 2017, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. [6817920] [17-1220] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2017 09:03 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee of $505.00 was received. [4] [6817208] [17-1220] (SP) [Entered: 02/08/2017 09:33 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson shall file, on or before March 15, 2017, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6816222] DW [2] [6816222] [17-1220] (CG) [Entered: 02/03/2017 11:56 AM]

1 #4

Notice to District Court

1 #3

Fee Notice

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

#22

(#24) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson to extend time to file brief. [24] [6835158] [17-1217, 17-1222] (AB) [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:07 PM]

#21

(#23) Filed notice of change of address for Stephanie S. Carlson. [23] [6830986] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (JO) [Entered: 04/03/2017 03:23 PM]

#20

(#22) ORDER re: 1. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and obtain an Attorney. 2. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and obtain an attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Stephanie Carlson's requests for recruitment of counsel are DENIED. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 649 (7th Cir. 2007); Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 321 (7th Cir. 1993). Briefing in appeal nos. 17-1217 & 17-1222 shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/24/2017 for Stephanie S. Carlson. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/24/2017 for CSX Transportation, Inc. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/07/2017 for Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson. SCR [ # 6819202-3 ] [ # 6819224-2 ] [ # 6819202-2 ] [ # 6819224-3 ][22] [6827776] [17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (VG) [Entered: 03/22/2017 10:12 AM]

#2

(#3) Filed district court order dated 02/01/2017, Carlson now moves the court, pro se, to appoint an attorney for her, seemingly so that she may appeal the January 18 Order. Whereas Carlson appears to seek appellate counsel, her motion is DENIED. She is advised to make this request to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Forwarded to JKL, DW. [3] [6816268] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (RS) [Entered: 02/03/2017 02:09 PM]

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER re: Motion to Refund Plaintiff/ Appellants' Costs and Fees. [ # 27 ] The motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in the district court. This court does not collect or return docketing fees. SCR [28] [6851383] [17-1220] (MM) [Entered: 06/30/2017 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson to refund costs and fees paid for appeal 17-1220 as the district court erred and not the appellant. [27] [6850891] [17-1220] (MM) [Entered: 06/28/2017 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/15/2017 Final Order with 6/6/17 Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6845936-2] [6845936] [17-1220] (AP) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [26] [6845930] [17-1220] (AP) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED due to the lack of a final, appealable order. William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge. [25] [6841207] [17-1220] (AP) [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson to extend time to file brief. [24] [6835158] [17-1217, 17-1222] (AB) [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Filed notice of change of address for Stephanie S. Carlson. [23] [6830986] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (JO) [Entered: 04/03/2017 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER re: 1. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and obtain an Attorney. 2. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and obtain an attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Stephanie Carlson's requests for recruitment of counsel are DENIED. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 649 (7th Cir. 2007); Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 321 (7th Cir. 1993). Briefing in appeal nos. 17-1217 & 17-1222 shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/24/2017 for Stephanie S. Carlson. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/24/2017 for CSX Transportation, Inc. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/07/2017 for Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson. SCR [ # 6819202-3 ] [ # 6819224-2 ] [ # 6819202-2 ] [ # 6819224-3 ][22] [6827776] [17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (VG) [Entered: 03/22/2017 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re: 1. Motion by Defendant-Appellee CSX Transportation, Inc. to seal confidential documents pursuant to Seventh Circuit Operating Procedure 10. 2. Motion by Defendant-Appellee CSX Transportation, Inc. to seal limited portions of certain filings disclosing the parties' confidential settlement agreement. IT IS ORDERED that the motions to seal are GRANTED as follows. In appeal nos. 15-1374 and 17-1220, the clerk of this court shall maintain under seal the nine sealed documents transmitted from the district court. In appeal no. 17-1217, the clerk of this court shall remove documents no. 69, 70, 71 and 78 from this court's docket because they are not relevant to the issues on appeal. These documents shall be maintained under seal in the district court. The clerk of this court shall maintain under seal documents no. 152, 156, 162, 166, and 179. In appeal no. 17-1222, the clerk of this court shall remove documents no. 49 and 51 from this court's docket because they are not relevant to the issues on appeal. The documents shall be maintained under seal in the district court. The clerk of this court shall maintain documents no. 76, 80, 86, 90, and 103 under seal. The clerk of this court shall also seal the following items on this court's docket: docket entries 43, 45-5, and 48-6 in appeal no. 15-1374; docket entries 1, 8, 12-5, and 15-6 in appeal no. 17-1220; docket entries 1, 5, 8, and 13-6 in appeal no. 17-1217; and docket entries 1, 6, 7, 10, 13-4, and 18-6 in appeal no. 17-1222. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Carlson should not include information about the settlement agreement in her filings unless necessary, and if confidential information is included she should request that the document be filed under seal. SCR [ # 20 ] [ # 19 ] [21] [6826625] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (VG) [Entered: 03/17/2017 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Motion by Appellee CSX Transportation, Inc. in 15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220 to seal LIMITED PORTIONS OF CERTAIN FILINGS DISCLOSING THE PARTIES CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. [20] [6825394] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (McIntyre, M.) [Entered: 03/13/2017 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to the District Court to transmit the record on appeal. Record on Appeal due by 03/23/2017 [9] [6820388] [17-1220] (JK) [Entered: 02/21/2017 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed district court order dated 02/17/2017, AMENDED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT, DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE, AND FOR SANCTIONS. Forwarded to JKL, DW. [8] [6820247] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (RS) [Entered: 02/21/2017 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson. [7] [6820240] [17-1220] (AB) [Entered: 02/21/2017 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 02/16/2017 Limited Remand Order sent to the District Court Clerk. [6819404-2] [6819404] [17-1220, 17-1222] (FP) [Entered: 02/16/2017 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: On February 7, 2017, the district court issued a Notice of Clerical Error, in which it explained that it made an error in its January 18, 2017, order and would correct that error if this court granted it leave to do so. In light of the district court's statement that it is inclined to amend its January 18 order, these appeals are REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with its notice dated February 7, 2017. See Fed. R. App. P. 12.1; Cir. R. 57. This court will retain jurisdiction and counsel for the appellee shall file a status report with this court within seven days of the district court correcting its order. SCR [6] [6819402] [17-1220, 17-1222] (FP) [Entered: 02/16/2017 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The court, on its own initiative, amends the order that it issued on February 3, 2017, to reflect that appellants memorandum is due on or before February 15, 2017. Appellant shall file, on or before February 15, 2017, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. [6817920] [17-1220] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2017 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee of $505.00 was received. [4] [6817208] [17-1220] (SP) [Entered: 02/08/2017 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed district court order dated 02/01/2017, Carlson now moves the court, pro se, to appoint an attorney for her, seemingly so that she may appeal the January 18 Order. Whereas Carlson appears to seek appellate counsel, her motion is DENIED. She is advised to make this request to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Forwarded to JKL, DW. [3] [6816268] [15-1374, 17-1217, 17-1222, 17-1220] (RS) [Entered: 02/03/2017 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson shall file, on or before March 15, 2017, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6816222] DW [2] [6816222] [17-1220] (CG) [Entered: 02/03/2017 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/16/2017. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/16/2017 for Appellant Stephanie S. Carlson. [1] [6816065] [17-1220] (FP) [Entered: 02/02/2017 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant