This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:02:16 (UTC).

Stephane Wantou Siantou v. CVS RX Services Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Stephane Wantou Siantou filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CVS RX Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2262

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

STEPHANE J. WANTOU SIANTOU

STEPHANE WANTOU

Big Spring, TX 79720

Defendant / Appellee

CVS RX SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Edward Kenney Esq.

Attorney at DK ASSOCIATES, LLC

5425 Wisconsin Avenue

Chevy Chase, MD 20815

Stephane Wantou

714 Baylor Boulevard

Big Spring, TX 79720

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Harris

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

1601 Cherry Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Sarah Elizabeth Henninger

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

John Moretta

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, PC

1 Financial Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Richard Russell Harris

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

1601 Cherry Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Maurice Baskin

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

John B. Moretta

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, PC

1 Financial Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION by Stephane Wantou in 19-2262 construed as motion to extend filing time for informal opening brief entitled "unopposed motion to stay the briefing order". [1000655156] [19-2262, 19-2313] AW [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:07 PM]

#18

(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 02/05/2020, and Informal Opening/Response Brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000656130] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:04 PM]

#16

(#16) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file electronically.[ # 10 ] Copies to all parties. [1000646673] [19-2262, 19-2313] LDJ [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:28 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION by Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2262, 19-2313 for leave to file electronically. [1000642920] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:35 AM]

#15

(#15) Notice issued re: [ # 10 ] Motion for leave to file. Mailed to: Stephane Siantou. . [19-2262, 19-2313] MFT [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:48 AM]

14 #1

Disclosure request

14 #2

Form

#13

(#13) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Siantou. Siantou's informal Opening Brief due 01/06/2020 and CVS RX Services' informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:56 AM]

#12

(#12) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 19-2262, 19-2313. Due: 12/26/2019. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:42 AM]

#11

(#11) STATUS OF COUNSEL FORM by Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2262, 19-2313. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:37 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard R. Harris, Esq. for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2313, 19-2262. [1000639940] [19-2313, 19-2262] Richard Harris [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:09 PM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by CVS RX Services Inc.. [19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:47 PM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE ISSUED to Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2313, 19-2262 re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Stephane Siantou 714 Baylor Blvd Big Spring, TX 79720. Status of Counsel due 12/09/2019. [19-2313, 19-2262] TF [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:33 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maurice Baskin for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2313, 19-2262. [1000631359] [19-2313, 19-2262] Maurice Baskin [Entered: 11/21/2019 05:20 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2262. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000631086] [19-2262, 19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:25 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John B. Moretta for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2262. [1000631072] [19-2262, 19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:19 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2313 with 19-2262(L). Cross-appeal appellant: STEPHANE J. WANTOU SIANTOU.. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Harris. [1000629845] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:45 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00543-PWG. Mailed to: Harris, Moretta. [19-2262] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:45 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 02/05/2020, and Informal Opening/Response Brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000656130] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION by Stephane Wantou in 19-2262 construed as motion to extend filing time for informal opening brief entitled "unopposed motion to stay the briefing order". [1000655156] [19-2262, 19-2313] AW [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file electronically.[ # 10 ] Copies to all parties. [1000646673] [19-2262, 19-2313] LDJ [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice issued re: [ # 10 ] Motion for leave to file. Mailed to: Stephane Siantou. . [19-2262, 19-2313] MFT [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2262, 19-2313 re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Siantou. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Siantou. Siantou's informal Opening Brief due 01/06/2020 and CVS RX Services' informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 19-2262, 19-2313. Due: 12/26/2019. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS OF COUNSEL FORM by Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2262, 19-2313. [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2262, 19-2313 for leave to file electronically. [1000642920] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard R. Harris, Esq. for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2313, 19-2262. [1000639940] [19-2313, 19-2262] Richard Harris [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by CVS RX Services Inc.. [19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE ISSUED to Stephane J. Wantou Siantou in 19-2313, 19-2262 re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Stephane Siantou 714 Baylor Blvd Big Spring, TX 79720. Status of Counsel due 12/09/2019. [19-2313, 19-2262] TF [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maurice Baskin for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2313, 19-2262. [1000631359] [19-2313, 19-2262] Maurice Baskin [Entered: 11/21/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2262. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000631086] [19-2262, 19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John B. Moretta for CVS RX Services Inc. in 19-2262. [1000631072] [19-2262, 19-2313] John Moretta [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2313 with 19-2262(L). Cross-appeal appellant: STEPHANE J. WANTOU SIANTOU.. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Harris. [1000629845] [19-2262, 19-2313] TF [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00543-PWG. Mailed to: Harris, Moretta. [19-2262] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00543-PWG. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2262] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.