This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/05/2022 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

Steele v. USPS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Steele filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against USPS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50583

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Larry R. Steele

Fort Stockton, TX 79735-0000

Defendant / Appellees

United States Postal Service

State of Texas

United States of America

Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice

Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Larry R. Steele

Attorney at CID Lynaugh Prison

1098 S. Highway 2037

Fort Stockton, TX 79735-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Mark Gabriel Martinez

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Larry R. Steele [22-50583] (MVM) [Entered: 07/07/2022 11:42 AM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Larry R. Steele advising no transcripts. [22-50583] (MRW) [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:22 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9891825-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/06/2022 for Appellant Larry R. Steele [22-50583] (MVM) [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Larry R. Steele. Fee deadline satisfied. [22-50583] (MRW) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9891825-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/06/2022 for Appellant Larry R. Steele [22-50583] (MVM) [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Larry R. Steele advising no transcripts. [22-50583] (MRW) [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Larry R. Steele [22-50583] (MVM) [Entered: 07/07/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYAN COLLIER, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant