This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 05:35:46 (UTC).

Statewide Bonding, Inc., et al v. DHS, et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Statewide Bonding, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5364

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Statewide Bonding, Inc.

Mike Donovan

Nexus Services, Inc.

Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Kirstjen M. Nielsen, in her individual capacity

Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS")

United States Department of Homeland Security, "DHS"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Michael Shoreman

Attorney at McFadden & Shoreman, PC

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036-5334

Mario Williams

Attorney at Ndh LLC

44 Broad Street Nw, Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Matthew J. Glover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1822123] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02083-JEB filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5364. [19-5364] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:37 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1822125] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/14/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/14/2020 [19-5364] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:38 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1822477] filed by Matthew J. Glover and co-counsel Abby C. Wright on behalf of Appellees DHS, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Chad F. Wolf. [19-5364] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 01/02/2020 09:06 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1822477] filed by Matthew J. Glover and co-counsel Abby C. Wright on behalf of Appellees DHS, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Chad F. Wolf. [19-5364] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 01/02/2020 09:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1822125] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/14/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/14/2020 [19-5364] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1822123] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02083-JEB filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5364. [19-5364] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5364] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.