This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/22/2021 at 06:13:22 (UTC).

State of Texas v. USA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 State of Texas filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40618

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

State of Texas

State of Louisiana

Sheriff Brad Coe

Defendant / Appellants

United States of America

Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Customs and Border Protection

United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, In his official capacity

Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, In his official capacity

Tracy Renaud, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, in her official capacity

Amicus Curiae

FIEL Houston

Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services

Immigration Reform Law Institute

State of Arizona

State of Alabama

State of Arkansas

State of Florida

State of Georgia

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Judd Edward Stone II

Kathryn Cherry

Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.

Patrick K. Sweeten

Benjamin D. Wilson

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sean Janda

Daniel David Hu

Erez Reuveni

H. Thomas Byron III

Sarah Elaine Harrington

Michael Shih

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Spencer Amdur

Kathryn Lynn Huddleston

Omar C. Jadwat

Cody Wofsy

Matt A. Crapo

Drew C. Ensign

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

Amicus Brief

Open Document #1

Motion to File a Brief as Amicus

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Amicus Brief

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Amicus Brief

Open Document #1

Motion to File a Brief as Amicus

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellees State of Louisiana and State of Texas in 21-40618 [ # 9683908-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 11/01/2021. [21-40618] (ABT) [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:52 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA. Extension Granted to and including 11/08/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/08/2021 for Appellants Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States of America [21-40618] (RLL) [Entered: 10/19/2021 02:49 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREPLY filed by Appellants DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [9692282-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees State of Louisiana and State of Texas [ # 9691598-2 ], to the Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellants DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9683425-2 ]. Date of Service: 10/19/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Amdur, Crapo, Ensign, Huddleston, Jadwat, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Byron, Harrington, Hu, Janda, Reuveni, Shih; Attorney for Appellees: Cherry, Murrill, Stone, Sweeten, Wilson. [21-40618] (Sean Janda ) [Entered: 10/19/2021 01:56 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by State of Louisiana and State of Texas [9691598-1] to the Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellants DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9683425-2 ] Date of Service: 10/18/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Amdur, Crapo, Ensign, Huddleston, Jadwat, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Byron, Harrington, Hu, Janda, Reuveni, Shih; Attorney for Appellees: Cherry, Murrill, Stone, Sweeten, Wilson. [21-40618] (Benjamin D. Wilson ) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketThe Motion to file amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute in 21-40618 [ # 9689316-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [21-40618] (CCR) [Entered: 10/18/2021 09:31 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION to file amicus brief [9689316-2] Date of Service: 10/14/2021 Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 10/25/2021 for Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute [21-40618] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by Immigration Reform Law Institute to file amicus brief [9689316-2] Date of service: 10/14/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Amdur, Crapo, Ensign, Huddleston, Jadwat, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Byron, Harrington, Hu, Janda, Reuveni, Shih; Attorney for Appellees: Cherry, Murrill, Stone, Sweeten, Wilson [21-40618] (Matt A. Crapo ) [Entered: 10/14/2021 02:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Unfiled Amicus Brief because The party needs leave of Court to file the Amicus Brief. [21-40618] (DMS) [Entered: 10/14/2021 12:19 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION filed by Appellees State of Louisiana and State of Texas for rehearing en banc [9683908-2]. Date of Service: 10/07/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Amdur, Crapo, Ensign, Huddleston, Jadwat, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Byron, Harrington, Hu, Janda, Reuveni, Shih; Attorney for Appellees: Cherry, Murrill, Stone, Sweeten, Wilson [21-40618] (Benjamin D. Wilson ) [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:23 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: new guidance that supersedes the challenged memoranda in this case has been issued and is set to go into effect on November 29, 2021. Date of service: 10/06/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Amdur, Crapo, Ensign, Huddleston, Jadwat, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Byron, Harrington, Hu, Janda, Reuveni, Shih; Attorney for Appellees: Cherry, Murrill, Stone, Sweeten, Wilson [21-40618] (Sean Janda ) [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Rule 28(j) received from Appellants Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA because This document is premature [21-40618] (DMS) [Entered: 10/04/2021 10:41 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
08/24/2021

DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Adam Kirschner is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:Attorney was trial counsel and filed notice of appeal only. Other counsel has made appearance.. [21-40618] (DMS) [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:05 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40618] (Spencer Amdur ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 06:59 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION by Not Parties FIEL Houston and Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services to file amicus brief [9650903-2] Date of Service: 08/23/2021 [21-40618] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by FIEL Houston and RAICES to file amicus brief [9650903-2] Date of service: 08/23/2021 via US mail - Appellee Coe; Attorney for Appellant: Kirschner; email - Attorney for Appellants: Hu, Janda, Reuveni; Attorney for Appellees: Murrill, Sweeten [21-40618] (Spencer Amdur ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 06:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40618] (H. Thomas Byron III) [Entered: 08/23/2021 04:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and USA for stay pending appeal [9650554-2] Ruling is requested by: 08/30/2021. Date of service: 08/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Hu, Janda, Kirschner, Reuveni; Attorney for Appellees: Murrill, Sweeten [21-40618] (Sean Janda ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:15 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021

DocketAttorney Sean Janda added as counsel of record for Appellants USA, Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, DHS, United States Customs and Border Protection, ICE, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Tracy Renaud in 21-40618 [21-40618] (CAG) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:07 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40618] (Michael Shih ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 12:37 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40618] (Sean Janda ) [Entered: 08/23/2021 12:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9650352-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 09/07/2021 for Appellants Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States of America [21-40618] (RLL) [Entered: 08/23/2021 12:10 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA [21-40618] (RLL) [Entered: 08/23/2021 11:26 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less