This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/27/2022 at 17:26:40 (UTC).

State of Texas v. Biden

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 State of Texas filed an Other lawsuit against Biden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10806

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

State of Texas

State of Missouri

Defendant / Appellants

Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States of America

United States of America

Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States Department of Homeland Security

Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection

United States Customs and Border Protection

Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Tracy Renaud, in her official capacity as Acting Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Amicus Curiae

American Civil Liberties Union

Law School Clinics

American Civil Liberties Union of Texas

Non-Profit Organizations

American Immigration Council

American Immigration Lawyers Association

Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Incorporated

Center for Gender & Refugee Studies

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William Thomas Thompson

Attorney at Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 009)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Judd Edward Stone II

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

209 W. 14Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Lanora Christine Pettit

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Benjamin D. Wilson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Dean John Sauer

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

207 W. High Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101-0000

Jesus Armando Osete

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

207 W. High Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Christopher Ward

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Joseph Anton Darrow Esq.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Erez Reuveni

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Immigration Litigation

450 5Th Street, N.W., Liberty Square Building

Washington, DC 20001

Brian Walters Stoltz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Cody Wofsy

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Blaine Bookey

Attorney at UC Hastings College of the Law

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102-4978

Other Attorneys

Thomas Molnar Fisher

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

302 W. Washington Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Alan J. Stone

Attorney at Milbank, L.L.P.

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Matt A. Crapo

6850 Rolling Creek Way

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Court Order

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION to stay issuance of the mandate [9760757-2] Mandate issue date canceled.. [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA to stay issuance of the mandate [9760757-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2022 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bookey, Crapo, Fisher, Stone, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Osete, Pettit, Sauer, Stone, Thompson, Wilson [21-10806] (Joseph Anton Darrow ) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:18 PM]

Open Document

SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [9745385-2] was filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA on 12/29/2021. Supreme Court Number: 21-954. [21-10806] (SMC) [Entered: 12/30/2021 02:38 PM]

Open Document

TECHNICAL REVISION MADE TO OPINION. [9733213-2] [21-10806] (NFD) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:50 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. Costs Taxed Against: Each Party Bear Its Own Costs on Appeal. [21-10806] (NFD) [Entered: 12/14/2021 01:10 PM]

Open Document

REPLY filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [9702554-1] to the Motion to vacate the decision of the district court filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-2 ], to the Motion to remand case filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-3 ], to the Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-4 ], to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees State of Texas and State of Missouri [ # 9702017-2 ]. Date of Service: 11/01/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bookey, Crapo, Fisher, Stone, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Osete, Pettit, Sauer, Stone, Thompson, Wilson. [21-10806] (Erez Reuveni ) [Entered: 11/01/2021 06:29 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Court Order 21-10806

Open Document #5

Describe Attachment

Open Document #4

Describe Attachment

Open Document #3

Describe Attachment

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER denying Motion to stay issuance of the mandate filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9760757-2 ] Mandate issue date is 02/03/2022 [21-10806] (LLL) [Entered: 01/26/2022 08:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION to stay issuance of the mandate [9760757-2] Mandate issue date canceled.. [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA to stay issuance of the mandate [9760757-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2022 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bookey, Crapo, Fisher, Stone, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Osete, Pettit, Sauer, Stone, Thompson, Wilson [21-10806] (Joseph Anton Darrow ) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [9745385-2] was filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA on 12/29/2021. Supreme Court Number: 21-954. [21-10806] (SMC) [Entered: 12/30/2021 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTECHNICAL REVISION MADE TO OPINION. [9733213-2] [21-10806] (NFD) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. Costs Taxed Against: Each Party Bear Its Own Costs on Appeal. [21-10806] (NFD) [Entered: 12/14/2021 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-10806 Affirmed ] Judge: RHB , Judge: KDE , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 02/04/2022; denying Motion to vacate the decision of the district court filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-2 ]; denying Motion to remand case filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-3 ]; denying Motion for limited remand filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-4 ] [21-10806] (This opinion includes URL material that is archived by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Library, and made available at http://www.lb5.uscourts.gov/ArchivedURLS/.) (NFD) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Barksdale, Engelhardt, Oldham. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Brian Christopher Ward arguing for Appellant Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Appellant Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Jaddou, Ur M., Appellant Acting Director Johnson, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Appellant Secretary Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Appellant Acting Commissioner Miller, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Appellant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Appellant United States Customs and Border Protection, Appellant United States Department of Homeland Security, Appellant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Benjamin D. Wilson arguing for Appellee State of Texas [21-10806] (PFT) [Entered: 11/02/2021 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [9702554-1] to the Motion to vacate the decision of the district court filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-2 ], to the Motion to remand case filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-3 ], to the Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA [ # 9701240-4 ], to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees State of Texas and State of Missouri [ # 9702017-2 ]. Date of Service: 11/01/2021 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bookey, Crapo, Fisher, Stone, Wofsy; Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Osete, Pettit, Sauer, Stone, Thompson, Wilson. [21-10806] (Erez Reuveni ) [Entered: 11/01/2021 06:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COURT ORDER carrying with the case Motion to vacate the decision of the district court filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-2 ]; carrying with the case Motion to remand case filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-3 ]; carrying with the case Motion for limited remand filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services [ # 9701240-4 ] [21-10806] (LLL) [Entered: 11/01/2021 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Tracy Renaud in 21-10806 substituted by Appellant Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services in 21-10806 [21-10806] (LLL) [Entered: 11/01/2021 01:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant Tracy Renaud in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant ICE in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant United States Customs and Border Protection in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant DHS in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant USA in 21-10806, Attorney Brian Christopher Ward for Appellant Joseph R. Biden Jr. in 21-10806 [21-10806] (LLL) [Entered: 08/18/2021 08:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION by Not Parties American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Incorporated, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Human Rights First, Justice Action Center, National Immigration Law Center, Round Table of Former Immigration Judges and Southern Poverty Law Center to file amicus brief [9645577-2] Date of Service: 08/17/2021 [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION by Amici Curiae Non-Profit Organizations and Former Immigration Judges to file amicus brief [9645577-2] Date of service: 08/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Sauer, Thompson [21-10806] (Blaine Bookey ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 11:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION by Not Parties American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Texas to file amicus brief in support of motion for stay [9645574-2] Date of Service: 08/17/2021 [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION by American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Texas to file amicus brief [9645574-2] Date of service: 08/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Sauer, Thompson [21-10806] (Cody Wofsy ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 09:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services in 21-10806 [ # 9645525-2 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services in 21-10806 [ # 9645525-3 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants USA, DHS, ICE, United States Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ms. Tracy Renaud, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services in 21-10806 [ # 9645525-4 ] Response/Opposition due on 08/18/2021. [21-10806] (CBW) [Entered: 08/17/2021 06:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9645525-2 ] Date of Service: 08/17/2021 [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and United States Customs and Border Protection. Date of service: 08/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Sauer, Thompson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Darrow [21-10806] (Brian Christopher Ward ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 05:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION for stay pending appeal [9645525-2] Ruling is requested by: 08/19/2021, to stay order of the Northern District of Texas dated 08/13/2021 [9645525-3], stay district court proceedings for at least 7 days [9645525-4]. Date of service: 08/17/2021 [21-10806] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., DHS, ICE, Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and USA for stay pending appeal [9645525-2] Ruling is requested by: 08/19/2021. Date of service: 08/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Darrow, Reuveni, Stoltz, Ward; Attorney for Appellees: Sauer, Thompson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Darrow [21-10806] (Brian Christopher Ward ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10806] (Erez Reuveni ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 07:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian Christopher Ward for Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10806] (Brian Christopher Ward ) [Entered: 08/16/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9643947-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/31/2021 for Appellants Joseph R. Biden Jr., Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States of America [21-10806] (MVM) [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. Troy Miller, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Ms. Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, ICE and USA [21-10806] (MVM) [Entered: 08/16/2021 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less