This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/17/2019 at 06:11:45 (UTC).

State of Oregon v. Blake Mcharo

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 State of Oregon filed an Other lawsuit against Blake Mcharo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1010

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

STATE OF OREGON, Department of Human Services

Debtors

In re: BLAKE MCHARO

INDIA ROSE MCHARO

Appellee

BLAKE MCHARO

Salem, OR 97305

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Carolyn G. Wade

Attorney at OREGON DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1162 Court Street Ne

Salem, OR 97304

Appellee Attorney

Blake Mcharo

3762 Lolo Pass Way

Salem, OR 97305

 

Court Documents

6 #13

EOR 64-65 Corrected Judgment Only Re Defendant Blake Mcharo

6 #12

EOR 61-63 Judgment Only Against Defendant Blake Mcharo

6 #11

EOR 52-60 Opinion Re Memorandum Decision

6 #10

EOR 51 Correspondence re Matter Under Advisement

6 #9

EOR 49-50 Default Judgment Against India Rose Mcharo

6 #8

EOR 47-48 Order for Default and Entry of Default Judgment

6 #7

EOR 38-46 Motion for Default Order and Supporting Documents

#6

EOR 37 Pre-Trial Conference Record of Proceeding

6 #5

EOR 34-36 Summons

6 #4

EOR 24-33 Complaint

6 #3

EOR 6-23 Notice of Appeal

6 #2

EOR 1-5 Adversary Proceeding Docket

6 #1

Appendix

#5

#4

3 #2

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

3 #1

Briefing Order

#2

form(s) sent

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Attorney Carolyn G. Wade for Appellant State of Oregon's excerpts of record; served on 03/04/2019 US mail - Appellee Mcharo; email - Attorney for Appellant: Wade. [19-1010] (CGW) [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Carolyn G. Wade for Appellant State of Oregon's brief on appeal; served on 03/04/2019 US mail - Appellee Mcharo; email - Attorney for Appellant: Wade. [19-1010] (CGW) [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court of COR filed in Bk. Ct. 02/07/2019. (PI) [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant State of Oregon. Copies to all parties. Appellant State of Oregon's opening brief due 03/04/2019. (PI) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: OR-19-1010. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 01/09/2019, and copy of memorandum. (PI) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less