This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/22/2022 at 07:00:37 (UTC).

State of Ohio, et al v. EPA, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 State of Ohio filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1081

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

State of Ohio

State of Alabama

State of Arkansas

State of Georgia

State of Indiana

State of Kansas

State of Kentucky

State of Louisiana

State of Mississippi

State of Missouri

State of Montana

State of Nebraska

State of Oklahoma

State of South Carolina

State of Texas

State of Utah

State of West Virginia

Respondents

Environmental Protection Agency

Michael S. Regan, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Intervenor

State of California

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Benjamin Michael Flowers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Ohio

30 East Broad Street, 17Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215-3428

Sylvia May Mailman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Ohio

615 West Superior Avenue, 11Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Alabama

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130

Nicholas J. Bronni

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Arkansas

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Stephen John Petrany

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Thomas M. Fisher

Attorney at Office of the Indiana Attorney General

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jeffrey Allyn Chanay

Attorney at Office of the Kansas Attorney General

120 Sw 10Th Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Topeka, KS 66612

Matthew Franklin Kuhn

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118

Frankfort, KY 40601

Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esquire

Attorney at Louisiana Attorney General

Po Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804

Joseph Scott St. John

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice

1885 North Third Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Justin L. Matheny

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Mississippi

Po Box 220

Jackson, MS 39205

Dean John Sauer

Attorney at Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Po Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102

Jeff Johnson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Missouri

815 Olive Street, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63101

David M.S. Dewhirst

Attorney at Montana Department of Justice

215 North Sanders

Helena, MT 59620-1401

James A. Campbell

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Nebraska

2115 State Capitol, Po Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

Justin D. Lavene Esquire

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Nebraska

2115 State Capitol, Po Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

Bryan Cleveland

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Oklahoma

313 Ne 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

James Emory Smith Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of South Carolina

Po Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

Judd Edward Stone II

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

209 W. 14Th Street, 7Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

Ryan Baasch

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947441] filed by Elizabeth Dubats on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of Illinois. [22-1081] (Dubats, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/20/2022 01:17 PM]

Open Document #3

Rule 26.1 Certificate

Open Document #2

Standing Declarations

Open Document #1

Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1947294] filed consolidating cases 22-1083 (Consolidation started 05/19/2022) with 22-1081; directing party to file in 22-1083 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/21/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/21/2022 [22-1081, 22-1083, 22-1084, 22-1085] [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:29 PM]

Open Document #2

Declarations

Open Document #1

Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947109] filed by Elizabeth B. Murrill and co-counsel Joseph Scott St. John on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana. [22-1081] (Murrill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:22 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1947083] filed consolidating cases 22-1084, 22-1085 (Consolidation started 05/18/2022) with 22-1081; directing party to file in 22-1084, 22-1085 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/17/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/17/2022 [22-1081, 22-1084, 22-1085] [Entered: 05/18/2022 10:50 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946839] filed by Chloe H. Kolman on behalf of Respondents EPA and Michael S. Regan. [22-1081] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 05/16/2022 05:36 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946760] filed by D. John Sauer and co-counsel Jeff Johnson on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri. [22-1081] (Sauer, Dean) [Entered: 05/16/2022 01:31 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946722] filed by David M.S. Dewhirst on behalf of Petitioner State of Montana. [22-1081] (Dewhirst, David) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:30 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946710] filed by Matthew F. Kuhn on behalf of Petitioner State of Kentucky. [22-1081] (Kuhn, Matthew) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:31 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946705] filed by Stephen J. Petrany on behalf of Petitioner State of Georgia. [22-1081] (Petrany, Stephen) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:06 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946694] filed by Edmund G. LaCour Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of Alabama. [22-1081] (LaCour, Edmund) [Entered: 05/16/2022 09:11 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1946639] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/27/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/13/2022. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/13/2022. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/27/2022. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/27/2022 [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:56 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1946638] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1946617-2 ] [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:55 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1946617] of a decision by federal agency filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia [Service Date: 05/12/2022 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party. [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:50 PM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947441] filed by Elizabeth Dubats on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of Illinois. [22-1081] (Dubats, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/20/2022 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1947408] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Environmental Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Sierra Club, Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 05/20/2022 ] [22-1081, 22-1083, 22-1084, 22-1085] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1947294] filed consolidating cases 22-1083 (Consolidation started 05/19/2022) with 22-1081; directing party to file in 22-1083 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/21/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/21/2022 [22-1081, 22-1083, 22-1084, 22-1085] [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1947269] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by States of California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, and Washington, et al. [Service Date: 05/19/2022 ] [22-1081, 22-1084, 22-1085] MOTION [1947269] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by City of New York, City of Los Angeles, DC, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island, State of Oregon, State of North Carolina, State of New York, State of New Mexico, State of New Jersey, State of Nevada, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Maine, State of Illinois, State of Hawaii, State of Delaware, State of Connecticut, State of Colorado and State of California in 22-1085, 22-1084, 22-1081 [Service Date: 05/19/2022 ] [22-1081, 22-1084, 22-1085]--[Edited 05/20/2022 by AH] (Meckenstock, Margaret) [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947109] filed by Elizabeth B. Murrill and co-counsel Joseph Scott St. John on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana. [22-1081] (Murrill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1947083] filed consolidating cases 22-1084, 22-1085 (Consolidation started 05/18/2022) with 22-1081; directing party to file in 22-1084, 22-1085 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/17/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/17/2022 [22-1081, 22-1084, 22-1085] [Entered: 05/18/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947069] filed by Lindsay S. See and co-counsel Michael R. Williams on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia. [22-1081] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 05/18/2022 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947001] filed by Bryan Cleveland on behalf of Petitioner State of Oklahoma. [22-1081] (Cleveland, Bryan) [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946995] filed by Jeffrey A. Chanay on behalf of Petitioner State of Kansas. [22-1081] (Chanay, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946939] filed by Justin L. Matheny on behalf of Petitioner State of Mississippi. [22-1081] (Matheny, Justin) [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946839] filed by Chloe H. Kolman on behalf of Respondents EPA and Michael S. Regan. [22-1081] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 05/16/2022 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946760] filed by D. John Sauer and co-counsel Jeff Johnson on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri. [22-1081] (Sauer, Dean) [Entered: 05/16/2022 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946722] filed by David M.S. Dewhirst on behalf of Petitioner State of Montana. [22-1081] (Dewhirst, David) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946710] filed by Matthew F. Kuhn on behalf of Petitioner State of Kentucky. [22-1081] (Kuhn, Matthew) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946705] filed by Stephen J. Petrany on behalf of Petitioner State of Georgia. [22-1081] (Petrany, Stephen) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946694] filed by Edmund G. LaCour Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of Alabama. [22-1081] (LaCour, Edmund) [Entered: 05/16/2022 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1946639] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/13/2022. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/27/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/13/2022. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/13/2022. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/27/2022. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/27/2022 [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1946638] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1946617-2 ] [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1946617] of a decision by federal agency filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia [Service Date: 05/12/2022 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party. [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [22-1081] [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey A. Chanay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen John Petrany

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Baasch