Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2021 at 05:15:47 (UTC).

State of New York, et al v. USEPA, et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 State of New York filed an Other lawsuit against USEPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-70684

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STATE OF MAINE

STATE OF RHODE ISLAND

STATE OF HAWAII

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

STATE OF VERMONT

COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

STATE OF ILLINOIS

STATE OF OREGON

STATE OF MINNESOTA

STATE OF MARYLAND

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS

CITY OF NEW YORK

STATE OF NEW YORK

STATE OF WASHINGTON

Respondents

MICHAEL REGAN, Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Katherine Tierney

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333

Alison B. Hoffman

Attorney at RI Office of Attorney General

150 South Main St.

Providence, RI 02903

Wade Hampton Hargrove Esquire III

Attorney at State of Hawaii Department of the Attorney General

465 South King Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

Aimee D. Thomson

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

1600 Arch St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Justin Kolber Esquire

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609-1001

Paul Kugelman Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Willis Doerr Esquire

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, 8Th Floor, West Wing

Trenton, NJ 08625

Daniel Isaac Rottenberg

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

69 W. Washington Street, 18Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Paul Garrahan

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street N.E.

Salem, OR 97301

Peter Surdo

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

445 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101

Joshua Morris Segal

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Loren L. AliKhan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

400 6Th Street, Nw, Suite 8100

Washington, DC 20001

I. Andrew Goldberg Esquire

Attorney at Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Shiva Prakash

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Sarah Kam

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Gavin Geraghty McCabe

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Jonathan C. Thompson

Attorney at Washington State Attorney General's Office

2425 Bristol Ct. Sw

Olympia, WA 98504

Respondent Attorney

Jessica O'Donnell

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Petitioner State of New York Correspondence: Certificate of Service. Date of service: 03/23/2021 [12050882] [21-70684] (Kam, Sarah) [Entered: 03/23/2021 01:38 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Petition for Review

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Petitioner State of New York Correspondence: Certificate of Service. Date of service: 03/23/2021 [12050882] [21-70684] (Kam, Sarah) [Entered: 03/23/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioners Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2021. Petitioner brief due 06/10/2021. Respondent brief due 07/12/2021 for Michael Regan and U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12049480] (JMR) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica O'Donnell