This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/24/2019 at 05:12:10 (UTC).

State of New York, et al v. EPA

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 State of New York filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1165

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

City of Boulder, (CO)

City of South Miami, (FL)

State of Colorado

City of Los Angeles

State of New Jersey

State of Illinois

State of North Carolina

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

State of Washington

State of Rhode Island

State of Vermont

State of California

City of New York

State of Oregon

State of Maryland

State of Connecticut

State of New York

State of Delaware

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

Respondent

Environmental Protection Agency

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lisa Jo Morelli

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of New Jersey

Po Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625-0112

Asher Paris Spiller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of North Carolina

Po Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602

Melissa Ann Hoffer Esquire

Attorney at Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Megan M. Herzog

Attorney at Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

David Alexander Zonana

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, Po Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612

Elizabeth B. Rumsey

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, Po Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612

Paul Andrew Garrahan

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1515 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 410

Portland, OR 97201

Steven Novick

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Roberta Rose James

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Maryland

1800 Washington Boulevard, Suite 6048

Baltimore, MD 21230-1719

Matthew Ivan Levine

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Connecticut

55 Elm Street, Po Box 120

Hartford, CT 06141-0120

Morgan Anna Costello

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of New York

The Capitol, New York State Department Of Law

Albany, NY 12224-0341

Michael J. Myers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of New York

The Capitol, New York State Department Of Law

Albany, NY 12224-0341

Andrew Gerard Frank

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Valerie Melissa Edge

Attorney at Delaware Department of Justice

102 West Water Street

Dover, DE 19904

Aimee Diane Thomson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

William F. Cooper

Attorney at State of Hawaii Department of the Attorney General

425 Queen Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

Karl A. Racine

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, District of Columbia

441 4Th Street, Nw, One Judiciary Square, Sixth Floor

Washington, DC 20001-2714

Scott Schwarz

Attorney at City of Philadelphia Law Department

One Parkway Building, 1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102-1595

Zachary C. Larsen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Michigan

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Laura Jensen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Maine

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1803445] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1803230] Align deadlines for initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions, and certified index to record with deadlines in the lead case, American Lung Assoc. v. EPA filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/22/2019 ] Length Certification: 717 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1803158] filed by Paul Garrahan and co-counsel Steven Novick on behalf of Petitioner State of Oregon. [19-1165] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802881] filed by Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [19-1165] (Thomson, Aimee) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1802500] filed consolidating cases 19-1165 (Consolidation started 08/16/2019) with 19-1140; directing party to file in 19-1165 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/16/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/16/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY [1802494] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1802486-2 ] [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802493] filed by Peter Surdo on behalf of Petitioner State of Minnesota. [19-1165] (Surdo, Peter) [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1802491] sent regarding attorney membership to Michael Nelson Feuer, Esquire for City of Los Angeles. Application for Admission due 09/16/2019. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR REVIEW [1802486] of a decision by federal agency filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 08/13/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William F. Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Jensen