This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

State of Louisiana v. USA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 State of Louisiana filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30213

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

STATE OF LOUISIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rachel Heron

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Jennifer Bailey Frederick

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

800 Lafayette Street

Lafayette, LA 70501-6832

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason Andrew Cavignac

Attorney at Couhig Partners, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert E. Couhig Jr.

Attorney at Couhig Partners, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Cathleen E. Marquardt. [19-30213] (Cathleen E. Marquardt ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30213] (Jason Andrew Cavignac ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:37 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30213] (Rachel Heron ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 04:17 PM]

Open Document #1

Unfiled Transcript Order

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert E. Couhig, Jr. for State of Louisiana for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30213] (Robert E. Couhig Jr.) [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:18 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant State of Louisiana is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-30213] (Cathleen E. Marquardt ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:00 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/18/2019 for Appellant State of Louisiana. [19-30213] (CB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:55 PM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant State of Louisianafor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cavignac, Couhig; Attorney for Appellee: Frederick. [19-30213] (Jason Andrew Cavignac ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document

US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State of Louisiana [19-30213] (SMC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011968-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/08/2019 for Appellant State of Louisiana [19-30213] (SMC) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:24 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/18/2019 for Appellant State of Louisiana. [19-30213] (CB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30213] (CB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 6:18-CV-174. Electronic ROA due on 05/15/2019. [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 04/30/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant State of Louisiana is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-30213] (Cathleen E. Marquardt ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Rachel Heron for Appellee USA in case 19-30213 [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30213] (Rachel Heron ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Est. Completion Dt: 04/26/2019, Est. No.of Pgs: 20, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 03/27/2019, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 04/26/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/14/2019. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 04/26/2019 for Cathleen E. Marquardt, Court Reporter [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Cathleen E. Marquardt. [19-30213] (Cathleen E. Marquardt ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the transcript order form received from Appellant State of Louisiana because it is a duplicate filing [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant State of Louisiana. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/14/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 04/08/2019 for Cathleen Marquardt, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9015671-2 ] [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant State of Louisianafor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cavignac, Couhig; Attorney for Appellee: Frederick. [19-30213] (Jason Andrew Cavignac ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jason Andrew Cavignac for Appellant State of Louisiana in case 19-30213 [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert E. Couhig Jr. for Appellant State of Louisiana in 19-30213 [19-30213] (AGL) [Entered: 03/26/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30213] (Jason Andrew Cavignac ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert E. Couhig, Jr. for State of Louisiana for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30213] (Robert E. Couhig Jr.) [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011968-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/08/2019 for Appellant State of Louisiana [19-30213] (SMC) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State of Louisiana [19-30213] (SMC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.