This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/22/2022 at 06:05:56 (UTC).

State of LA v. Centers for Disease

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 State of LA filed an Other lawsuit against Centers for Disease. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-30303

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

State of Louisiana

State of Arizona

State of Missouri

State of West Virginia

State of South Carolina

State of Texas

Defendant / Appellants

Centers for Disease Control and Prevention

Rochelle Walensky

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Xavier Becerra

United States Department of Homeland Security

Petitioner / Appellant

Innovation Law Lab

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Joseph Scott St. John

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Drew C. Ensign

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Dean John Sauer

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

207 W. High Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101-0000

Michael Everett Talent

Attorney at Office of The Missouri Attorney General

815 Olive Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Lindsay Sara See

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1900 Kanawha Boulevard, E., State Capitol

Charleston, WV 25305-0000

Thomas T. Hydrick

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

Leif A. Olson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 12548 (Mc-019), Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John Robinson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division

1100 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Joshua Dos Santos

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Sharon Swingle

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Monika Y. Langarica

Attorney at Center for Immigration Law and Policy

385 Charles E. Young Drive, P.O. Box 951476

Los Angeles, CA 90095

Ahilan T. Arulanantham

Attorney at UCLA School of Law

385 Charles E. Young Drive, E.

Los Angeles, CA 90095-1458

Talia Inlender

Attorney at Center for Immigration Law and Policy

385 Charles E. Young Drive, P.O. Box 951476

Los Angeles, CA 90095

Joseph Meyers

Attorney at National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild

2201 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

Victoria Neilson

Attorney at National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild

2201 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

Matthew Vogel

Attorney at National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild

2201 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

UNOPPOSED jOINT MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Xavier Becerra, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, DHS, HHS and Rochelle Walensky, Appellant Innovation Law Lab, and Appellees State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of South Carolina, State of Texas and State of West Virginia, Et Al to modify briefing schedule [9887675-2]. Date of service: 07/07/2022 [22-30303] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Xavier Becerra, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, DHS, HHS and Rochelle Walensky to establish briefing notice[9887675-2]. Date of service: 07/07/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arulanantham, Dos Santos, Inlender, Langarica, Meyers, Neilson, Robinson, Swingle, Vogel; Attorney for Appellees: Ensign, Hydrick, Murrill, Olson, Sauer, See, St. John, Talent [22-30303] (Joshua Dos Santos ) [Entered: 07/07/2022 04:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Leif A. Olson ) [Entered: 06/21/2022 08:35 AM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Lindsay Sara See ) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:54 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

Appendix

Open Document #1

Response/Opposition filed

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER granting joint motion to modify briefing schedule filed by Appellees State of South Carolina, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Arizona and Appellants DHS, HHS, Mr. Xavier Becerra, Rochelle Walensky, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and Innovation Law Lab [ # 9887675-2 ]. Federal Government and Proposed Intervenor's opening briefs due July 25, 2022; Federal Government's response to Proposed Intervenor's brief due August 24, 2022; Plaintiff States' consolidated response brief (with an 18,000 word limit) due August 31, 2022; Federal Government and Proposed Intervenor's reply briefs due September 21, 2022 [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 07/08/2022 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED jOINT MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Xavier Becerra, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, DHS, HHS and Rochelle Walensky, Appellant Innovation Law Lab, and Appellees State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of South Carolina, State of Texas and State of West Virginia, Et Al to modify briefing schedule [9887675-2]. Date of service: 07/07/2022 [22-30303] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Xavier Becerra, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, DHS, HHS and Rochelle Walensky to establish briefing notice[9887675-2]. Date of service: 07/07/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arulanantham, Dos Santos, Inlender, Langarica, Meyers, Neilson, Robinson, Swingle, Vogel; Attorney for Appellees: Ensign, Hydrick, Murrill, Olson, Sauer, See, St. John, Talent [22-30303] (Joshua Dos Santos ) [Entered: 07/07/2022 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Leif A. Olson for Appellee State of Texas in 22-30303 [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 06/29/2022 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellee State of Texas added to case. Reason: so that appearance form for Texas AG can be processed and he can receive electronic notifications. Mr. Olson advised that attorney Murrill is lead counsel overall and he is lead counsel for Texas in particular. [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 06/29/2022 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Leif A. Olson ) [Entered: 06/21/2022 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lindsay Sara See for party(s) Appellee State of West Virginia, in case 22-30303 [22-30303] (CB) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER that the opposed motion of Innovation Law Lab for stay of nationwide scope of preliminary injunction pending appeal is DENIED [ # 9861465-2 ]. [22-30303] (MCS) [Entered: 06/16/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph Scott St. John for Appellee State of Louisiana in 22-30303, by Attorney(s) Joseph Scott St. John for party(s) Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Missouri, etc in case 22-30303 [22-30303] (CB) [Entered: 06/15/2022 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of South Carolina in 22-30303, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of West Virginia in 22-30303, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Missouri in 22-30303, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Arizona in 22-30303, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Louisiana, etc. in 22-30303 [22-30303] (CB) [Entered: 06/15/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Lindsay Sara See ) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Dean John Sauer ) [Entered: 05/26/2022 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sharon Swingle for party(s) Appellant HHS Appellant Rochelle Walensky Appellant Xavier Becerra Appellant DHS Appellant Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, et al in case 22-30303 [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 05/25/2022 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua Dos Santos for party(s) Appellant HHS Appellant Rochelle Walensky Appellant Xavier Becerra Appellant DHS Appellant Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, et al in case 22-30303 [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 05/25/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:22-CV-885. Electronic ROA due on 06/09/2022. [22-30303] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/25/2022 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9855160-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30303] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/25/2022 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9854888-2] Parties added: Appellant Innovation Law Lab. NOA filed by Appellant Innovation Law Lab. [9854888-1] [22-30303] (AGL) [Entered: 05/25/2022 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30303] (Sharon Swingle ) [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30303] (Joshua Dos Santos ) [Entered: 05/24/2022 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [22-30303] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Xavier Becerra, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, HHS, DHS and Rochelle Walensky [22-30303] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ahilan T Arulanantham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Talia R. Inlender