This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/20/2022 at 06:02:20 (UTC).

State of Delaware v. BP America Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 State of Delaware filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against BP America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1096

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

STATE OF DELAWARE, ex rel. Kathleen Jennings, Attorney General of the State of Delaware

Defendant / Appellants

BP AMERICA INC

BP PLC

CHEVRON CORP

CHEVRON USA INC

CONOCOPHILLIPS

CONOCOPHILLIPS CO

PHILLIPS 66

PHILLIPS 66 CO

EXXON MOBIL CORP

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

XTO ENERGY INC

HESS CORP

MARATHON OIL CORP

MARATHON PETROLEUM CORP

MARATHON PETROLEUM CO LP

SPEEDWAY LLC

MURPHY OIL CORP

MURPHY USA

ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ralph K. Durstein Esq. III

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jameson A.L. Tweedie Esq.

Attorney at Delaware Department of Justice

391 Lukens Drive

New Castle, DE 19720

Christian D. Wright Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Catherine A. Gaul Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Matthew T. Heartney Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jonathan W. Hughes Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

3 Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John D. Lombardo Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Nancy G. Milburn Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Diana E. Reiter Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joshua D. Dick Esq.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas G. Hungar Esq.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Andrea E. Neuman Esq.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Russell S. Nolte Esq.

Attorney at Wilks Law

4250 Lancaster Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19805

William E. Thomson Esq. III

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David E. Wilks Esq.

Attorney at Wilks Law

4250 Lancaster Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19805

Steven M. Bauer Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel R. Brody Esq.

Attorney at Bartlit Beck

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Daniel J. Brown Esq.

Attorney at McCarter & English

405 North King Street, Renaissance Centre, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jameson R. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Bartlit Beck

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

75 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#120

(#120) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Shell Oil Co. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:53 PM]

#119

(#119) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:52 PM]

#118

(#118) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David C. Frederick, Esq. for Appellants Royal Dutch Shell PLC and Shell Oil Co Notice of Change of Party Names. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:51 PM]

115 #10

Joint Appendix (Volume 9)

115 #8

Joint Appendix (Volume 7)

115 #5

Joint Appendix (Volume 4)

115 #3

Joint Appendix (Volume 2)

115 #2

Joint Appendix (Volume 1)

115 #1

Joint Appendix (Index Volume)

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Victor M. Sher on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (VMS) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:54 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jameson R. Jones on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (JRJ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:37 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel R. Brody on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (DRB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:27 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Many of the defendants have appealed an order remanding this case back to state court. Because they filed a joint notice of appeal, the appellants must file a joint opening brief and reply brief. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. This appeal may raise issues similar to those raised in City of Hoboken v. Chevron Corp. (3d Cir. No. 21-2728). If any party believes this new appeal should be stayed pending No. 21-2728, an appropriate motion should be filed promptly. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:23 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Caption

1 #3

Memorandum

1 #2

Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Shell Oil Co. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David C. Frederick, Esq. for Appellants Royal Dutch Shell PLC and Shell Oil Co Notice of Change of Party Names. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#117) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: Index + 9 volumes (EAF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#116) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 03/17/2022 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA and XTO Energy Inc. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2022 by ECF. [22-1096][Edited docket text]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by MCW] (TJB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc., BP plc, CNX Resources Corp., Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2022 by ECF. [22-1096][Edited docket text]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by MCW] (TJB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrea E. Neuman on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (AEN) [Entered: 03/15/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William E. Thomson on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (WET) [Entered: 03/15/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephanie D. Biehl on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (SDB) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Margaret A. Tough on behalf of Appellant(s) Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (MT) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Margaret A. Tough on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (MT) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Appellant(s) Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Victor M. Sher on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (VMS) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jameson R. Jones on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (JRJ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel R. Brody on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (DRB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Many of the defendants have appealed an order remanding this case back to state court. Because they filed a joint notice of appeal, the appellants must file a joint opening brief and reply brief. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. This appeal may raise issues similar to those raised in City of Hoboken v. Chevron Corp. (3d Cir. No. 21-2728). If any party believes this new appeal should be stayed pending No. 21-2728, an appropriate motion should be filed promptly. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01429. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XTO Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant