This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/13/2019 at 06:28:11 (UTC).

State of California, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 State of California, filed an Other lawsuit against Wilbur Ross,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15456

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellees

CITY OF OAKLAND

CITY OF STOCKTON

CITY OF FREMONT

CITY OF LONG BEACH

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant / Appellants

U.S. CENSUS BUREAU

RON JARMIN, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the U.S. Census Bureau

WILBUR ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Commerce

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

David Robert Holmquist

Keith A. Yeomans

Sue Ann Evans Esquire

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Malia J. McPherson

Maria Bee

Erin Bernstein

John M. Luebberke

Harvey E. Levine Esquire

Michael J. Mais

Charles L. Coleman Esquire III

David Ilan Holtzman

Anna Ferrari

Todd Grabarsky

Michael J. Mongan

R. Matthew Wise Esquire

Noreen Patricia Skelly

Kathleen Alice Kenealy

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Carol Federighi

Gerard Sinzdak

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#6

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [11255672] [19-15456, 19-15457] (VS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11237512] (AD) [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and USDOC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/21/2019. [11236983] [19-15456] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docket(#5) Added attorney Michael J. Mongan for State of California. [11229094] (RL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docket(#4) Added attorney Gerard Sinzdak for Ron Jarmin U.S. Census Bureau Wilbur Ross USDOC. [11229087] (RL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gerard Joseph Sinzdak for Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 03/15/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11229021] [19-15456] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael James Mongan for Appellee State of California. Date of service: 03/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11228652] [19-15456] (Mongan, Michael) [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and United States Department of Commerce opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellees City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Stockton, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Unified School District and State of California answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11227322] (JBS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less