This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:28:11 (UTC).

State of California, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Wilbur Ross. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15456

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellees

CITY OF OAKLAND

CITY OF STOCKTON

CITY OF FREMONT

CITY OF LONG BEACH

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant / Appellants

U.S. CENSUS BUREAU

RON JARMIN, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the U.S. Census Bureau

WILBUR ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Commerce

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

David Robert Holmquist

Attorney at Los Angeles Unified School District

333 South Beaudry Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Keith A. Yeomans

Attorney at DANNIS WOLIVER KELLEY

115 Pine Avenue, Suite 500

Long Beach, CA 90802

Sue Ann Evans Esquire

Attorney at DANNIS WOLIVER KELLEY

115 Pine Avenue, Suite 500

Long Beach, CA 90802

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Erin Bernstein

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

One Frank Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Malia J. McPherson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

One Frank Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Maria Bee

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

One Frank Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

John M. Luebberke

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney-Stockton

425 North El Dorado Street

Stockton, CA 95202

Harvey E. Levine Esquire

Attorney at CITY O FREMONT

3300 Capitol Ave.

Fremont, CA 94537

Michael J. Mais

Attorney at LONG BEACH CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

333 W. Ocean Blvd.

Long Beach, CA 90802

Charles L. Coleman Esquire III

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Ilan Holtzman

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Noreen Patricia Skelly

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Anna Ferrari

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Todd Grabarsky

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Michael J. Mongan

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

R. Matthew Wise Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Kathleen Alice Kenealy

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 North Main Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Carol Federighi

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Gerard Sinzdak

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [11255672] [19-15456, 19-15457] (VS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:12 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and USDOC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/21/2019. [11236983] [19-15456] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:42 AM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [11255672] [19-15456, 19-15457] (VS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11237512] (AD) [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and USDOC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/21/2019. [11236983] [19-15456] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#5) Added attorney Michael J. Mongan for State of California. [11229094] (RL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#4) Added attorney Gerard Sinzdak for Ron Jarmin U.S. Census Bureau Wilbur Ross USDOC. [11229087] (RL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gerard Joseph Sinzdak for Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 03/15/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11229021] [19-15456] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael James Mongan for Appellee State of California. Date of service: 03/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11228652] [19-15456] (Mongan, Michael) [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and United States Department of Commerce opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellees City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Stockton, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Unified School District and State of California answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11227322] (JBS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.