This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 06:09:10 (UTC).

State of Alaska, et al v. Scott De La Vega, et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 State of Alaska filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Scott De La Vega. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35035

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE

MITCH ELLIS, in his official capacity as Chief of Refuges for the Alaska Region of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service

MARGARET EVERSON, in her official capacity as acting Director of the National Park Service

DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Interior

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

NATIONAL PARK SERVICE

GREGORY SIEKANIEC, in his official capacity as Alaska Regional Director, United States Fish and Wildlife Service

JOEL HARD, in his official capacity as Acting Alaska Regional Director, National Park Service

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

ALASKA WILDLIFE ALLIANCE

DENALI CITIZENS COUNCIL

WILDERNESS WATCH

NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION

THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES

KACHEMAK BAY CONSERVATION SOCIETY

ALASKANS FOR WILDLIFE

NORTHERN ALASKA ENVIRONMENTAL CENTER

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION

COPPER COUNTRY ALLIANCE

Plaintiff / Appellant

STATE OF ALASKA

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael S. Sawyer

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Andrew Christopher Mergen Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 23795, L'Enfant Plaza Station

Washington, DC 20026-3795

Varu Chilakamarri

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Litmans Esquire

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Katherine Grace Strong

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jessica M. Alloway

Attorney at AGAK - OFFICE OF THE ALASKA ATTORNEY GENERAL (ANCHORAGE)

1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Cheryl Rawls Brooking

Attorney at AGAK - OFFICE OF THE ALASKA ATTORNEY GENERAL (ANCHORAGE)

1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#2

#18

#16

#15

#12

#10

7 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

7 #5

Cross-Appeal Brief Chart

7 #4

Case Opening Packet

7 #3

Mediation Letter

7 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

7 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/18/2021, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12015253] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (CL) [Entered: 02/24/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#14) Appellee David Bernhardt in 21-35030, 21-35035 and 21-35056 substituted by Appellee Scott de la Vega in 21-35030, 21-35035 and 21-35056 [12008444] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (WL) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): Plaintiffs Safari Club International and State of Alaskas unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) for an extension of time to file the transcript designation is construed as a motion to stay appellate proceedings pending the district courts resolution of the Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1(f) certificate and is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until March 16, 2021. If no motion for further relief is filed before this date, the briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. Pursuant to the appellants request (included in Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]), Scott De La Vega is substituted for his predecessor, David Bernhardt, as Acting Secretary of the Department of the Interior. Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [12008428] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (WL) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant State of Alaska in 21-35035 Unopposed Motion to extend the time to file appellant designation of reporters transcript until 03/12/2021. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12002608] [21-35030, 21-35035] (Alloway, Jessica) [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Varu Chilakamarri for party(s) Appellee Margaret Everson Appellee Joel Hard Appellee Aurelia Skipworth Appellee USDOI Appellee Gregory Siekaniec Appellee Mitch Ellis Appellee National Park Service, in case 21-35030 Attorney(s) Varu Chilakamarri for party(s) Appellant Jim Kurth Appellant USDOI Appellant USFWS Appellant Gregory Siekaniec Appellant Mitch Ellis Appellant National Park Service Appellant David Bernhardt Appellant Joel Hard, in case 21-35056 Attorney(s) Varu Chilakamarri for party(s) Appellee Margaret Everson Appellee Joel Hard Appellee Aurelia Skipworth Appellee USDOI Appellee Gregory Siekaniec Appellee David Bernhardt Appellee Mitch Ellis Appellee National Park Service, in case 21-35035. [12001933] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (DJV) [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Varu Chilakamarri (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment & Natural Resources Division, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 7415 Washington, Dc, 20044) for Appellees David Bernhardt, Mitch Ellis, Margaret Everson, Joel Hard, National Park Service, Gregory Siekaniec, Aurelia Skipworth, USDOI and USFWS in 21-35030, 21-35035, Appellants David Bernhardt, Mitch Ellis, Joel Hard, Jim Kurth, National Park Service, Michael Reynolds, Gregory Siekaniec, USDOI and USFWS in 21-35056. Date of service: 02/12/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12001880] [21-35030, 21-35035, 21-35056] (Chilakamarri, Varu) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/23/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11992043] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (CL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11986902]. [21-35035] (AD) [Entered: 01/29/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant National Park Service in 21-35056 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/29/2021. [11986726] [21-35056, 21-35030, 21-35035] (Mergen, Andrew) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Michael S. Sawyer in 21-35030, 21-35035 and in 21-35056 substituted by Attorney Christopher Mergen in 21-35030, in 21-35035 and in 21-35056 [11985362] [21-35030, 21-35056, 21-35035] (RR) [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Christopher Mergen (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment & Natural Resources Division, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 7415 Washington, Dc, 20044) for Appellee David Bernhardt in 21-35030, 21-35035, Appellant David Bernhardt in 21-35056. Substitution for Attorney Michael S. Sawyer for Appellees David Bernhardt, Mitch Ellis, Margaret Everson, Joel Hard, National Park Service, Gregory Siekaniec, Aurelia Skipworth, USDOI and USFWS in 21-35030, Attorney Michael S. Sawyer for Appellees David Bernhardt, Mitch Ellis, Gregory Siekaniec, Aurelia Skipworth, Joel Hard, Margaret Everson, USFWS, National Park Service and USDOI in 21-35035, Attorney Michael S. Sawyer for Appellants David Bernhardt, Jim Kurth, Gregory Siekaniec, Mitch Ellis, USFWS, Michael Reynolds, Joel Hard, National Park Service and USDOI in 21-35056. Date of service: 01/28/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11985258] [21-35030, 21-35035, 21-35056] (Mergen, Andrew) [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants David Bernhardt, Mitch Ellis, Joel Hard, Jim Kurth, National Park Service, Michael Reynolds, Gregory Siekaniec, U.S. Department of the Interior and United States Fish and Wildlife Service Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/29/2021. First cross appeal brief due 04/23/2021 for Safari Club International and State of Alaska. Second brief on cross appeal due 05/24/2021 for Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaskans for Wildlife, David Bernhardt, Center for Biological Diversity, Copper Country Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, Mitch Ellis, Margaret Everson, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Joel Hard, Kachemak Bay Conservation Society, National Park Service, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Gregory Siekaniec, Sierra Club, Aurelia Skipworth, The Humane Society of the United States, The Wilderness Society, Inc., U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Wilderness Watch, Jim Kurth and Michael Reynolds. Third brief on cross appeal due 06/23/2021 for Safari Club International and State of Alaska. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11975865] [21-35056, 21-35030, 21-35035] (JBS) [Entered: 01/22/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/21/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11975601]. [21-35035] (AD) [Entered: 01/21/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant State of Alaska Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/21/2021. [11974997] [21-35035] (Alloway, Jessica) [Entered: 01/21/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant State of Alaska Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/21/2021. Transcript ordered by 02/12/2021. Transcript due 03/15/2021. Appellant State of Alaska opening brief due 04/23/2021. Appellees Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaskans for Wildlife, David Bernhardt, Center for Biological Diversity, Copper Country Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, Mitch Ellis, Margaret Everson, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Joel Hard, Kachemak Bay Conservation Society, National Park Service, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Gregory Siekaniec, Sierra Club, Aurelia Skipworth, The Humane Society of the United States, The Wilderness Society, Inc., U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Wilderness Watch answering brief due 05/24/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11964401] (JBS) [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KACHEMAK BAY CONSERVATION SOCIETY is a litigant