This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:04:23 (UTC).

State Bank of Texas v. Sam Parabia, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 State Bank of Texas filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Sam Parabia. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55154

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK, a California corporation

DOES, 1 through 10 inclusive

AYER CAPITAL ADVISORS, INC., a New York corporation

FARZIN MORENA, an individual

Defendant / Appellants

PERIN PARABIA, an individual

SAM PARABIA, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellee

STATE BANK OF TEXAS, a Texas state-chartered bank, as successor-in-interest to the original lender

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Stephen Francis Lopez

Attorney at Stephen F. Lopez Esq APC

600 B St

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John M. Whelan

Attorney at Worldwide Serving Group, Inc.

1299 E. Artesia Boulevard, Suite 200

Carson, CA 90746

Lawrence J. Hilton

4000 Macarthur Boulevard, East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11637533] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2020 09:55 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/19/2020, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11610885] (VS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:36 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602484] [20-55154] (Lopez, Stephen) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:06 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia opening brief due 05/13/2020. Appellee State Bank of Texas answering brief due 06/12/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11658191] (JN) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia. New requested due date is 05/13/2020. [11658035] [20-55154] (Lopez, Stephen) [Entered: 04/10/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11637533] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/19/2020, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11610885] (VS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11602543]. [20-55154] (AD) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602484] [20-55154] (Lopez, Stephen) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/20/2020. Appellants Perin Parabia and Sam Parabia opening brief due 04/13/2020. Appellee State Bank of Texas answering brief due 05/12/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596058] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less