This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:27 (UTC).

Standard Security Life Insuran, et al v. FCE Benefit Administrators, In

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Standard Security Life Insuran filed an Other lawsuit against FCE Benefit Administrators, In. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2336

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

STANDARD SECURITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

MADISON NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Mark A. Bradford

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-3433

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Clinton E. Cameron

Attorney at CLYDE & CO LLP

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Clinton E. Cameron for Appellees Madison National Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York. [6] [7021244] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2336] (Cameron, Clinton) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:52 AM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Tuesday, August 20, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [4] [7021218] [19-2336] (PS) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:31 AM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/20/2019 for FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Madison National Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/12/2019 for Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. JB [7021220] [19-2336] (PS) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:33 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Mark A. Bradford for Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. [3] [7020992] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2336] (Bradford, Mark) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:10 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. [2] [7018853] [19-2336] (VG) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:05 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Clinton E. Cameron for Appellees Madison National Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York. [6] [7021244] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2336] (Cameron, Clinton) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/20/2019 for FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Madison National Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/12/2019 for Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. JB [7021220] [19-2336] (PS) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Tuesday, August 20, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [4] [7021218] [19-2336] (PS) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Mark A. Bradford for Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. [3] [7020992] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2336] (Bradford, Mark) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.. [2] [7018853] [19-2336] (VG) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2019 for FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc. [1] [7017283] [19-2336] (ER) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.