This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:35 (UTC).

St. Louis Condominium Associat v. Rockhill Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 St Louis Condominium Associat filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rockhill Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12716

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

ST. LOUIS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Salvatore Metta

Attorney at Levy Law Group

3399 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Lauren Levy

Attorney at Levy Law Group

3399 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Stuart H. Sobel

Attorney at Siegfried Rivera Hyman Lerner De La Torre Mars & Sobel, PA

201 Alhambra Cir 11Th Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134-5108

Helio De La Torre

Attorney at Siegfried Rivera Hyman Lerner De La Torre Mars & Sobel, PA

201 Alhambra Cir 11Th Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134-5108

Susan Catania Odess

Attorney at Siegfried Rivera Hyman Lerner De La Torre Mars & Sobel, PA

201 Alhambra Cir 11Th Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134-5108

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Patricia Sanders and Dawn M. Savino as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 07/26/2019. [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:00 AM]

Open Document #2

USDC Order or Motion RE: FRAP4 or Restitution

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion RE: FRAP4 or Restitution

Open Document

Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company DE #: 270,272 [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:22 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stuart H. Sobel for Appellee St. Louis Condominium Association, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12716] (ECF: Stuart Sobel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stuart H. Sobel for St. Louis Condominium Association, Inc.. [19-12716] (ECF: Stuart Sobel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:23 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:54 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:53 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Rockhill Insurance Company, Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 05/28/2019 - 06/04/2019, Status Conference 05/16/2019 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/22/2019. [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:27 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Levy for Rockhill Insurance Company. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 07/12/2019 as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:31 PM]

Open Document #5

USDC Judgment- Doc #269

Open Document #4

USDC Order- Doc #209

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #208

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Dawn M. Savino as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 07/26/2019. [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Patricia Sanders and Dawn M. Savino as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 07/26/2019. [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC Restitution Order as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company was filed on 08/23/2019. Docket Entry 291, 292 [Entered: 09/10/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company DE #: 270,272 [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stuart H. Sobel for Appellee St. Louis Condominium Association, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12716] (ECF: Stuart Sobel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stuart H. Sobel for St. Louis Condominium Association, Inc.. [19-12716] (ECF: Stuart Sobel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Rockhill Insurance Company, Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Proceeding Type and Date: Status Conference 05/22/2019. [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Rockhill Insurance Company, Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 05/28/2019 - 06/04/2019, Status Conference 05/16/2019 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/22/2019. [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Lauren Levy for Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Levy for Rockhill Insurance Company. [19-12716] (ECF: Lauren Levy) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 07/12/2019 as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Rockhill Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee St. Louis Condominium Association, Inc. [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less