This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2019 at 06:08:31 (UTC).

Sports Management Network, Inc v. Kurt Busch, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Sports Management Network, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kurt Busch. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1338

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FRASCO, CAPONIGRO, WINEMAN & SCHEIBLE

KURT BUSCH

KURT BUSCH, INC.

JOHN P. CAPONIGRO

Plaintiff / Appellant

SPORTS MANAGEMENT NETWORK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David C. Anderson

Attorney at Collins, Einhorn, Farrell

4000 Town Center, Ninth Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Lindsey A. Peck

Attorney at Collins Einhorn Farrell

4000 Town Center, Suite 909

Southfield, MI 48075

Eugene Driker

Attorney at Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker

333 W. Fort Street, Suite 1200

Detroit, MI 48226

Todd Rhys Mendel

Attorney at Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker

333 W. Fort Street, Suite 1200

Detroit, MI 48226

John T. Sheets

Attorney at Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker

333 W. Fort Street, Suite 1200

Detroit, MI 48226-3281

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dean M. Googasian

Attorney at Googasian Firm

6895 Telegraph Road

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301

Thomas H. Howlett

Attorney at Law Office

6895 Telegraph Road

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301

George A. Googasian

Attorney at Law Office

6895 Telegraph Road

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Letter sent by Mediation Office to hold briefing in abeyance pending mediation. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 06/24/2019. [Please open letter for important details and deadlines.] [19-1309, 19-1338] (LMR) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:24 PM]

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dean M. Googasian for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:40 AM]

#12

(#12) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Dean M. Googasian for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc.. Certificate of Service:04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:36 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by Dean M. Googasian. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:34 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by George A. Googasian. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (GAG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:30 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by Thomas H. Howlett. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (THH) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:24 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by John T. Sheets. Certificate of Service: 04/05/2019. [19-1338] (JTS) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:46 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Todd Rhys Mendel for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (TRM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:03 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by Eugene Driker. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (ED) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:59 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by Todd R. Mendel. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (TRM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:54 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Letter sent by Mediation Office to hold briefing in abeyance pending mediation. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 06/24/2019. [Please open letter for important details and deadlines.] [19-1309, 19-1338] (LMR) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#16) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [14] Transcript to be filed in district court by Lawrence Raymond Przybysz by 05/30/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 04/30/2019 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#15) NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [14]. Lawrence Raymond Przybysz's acknowledgement is due 04/29/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#14) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Lawrence Raymond Przybysz, filed by Mr. Thomas H. Howlett for Sports Management Network, Inc.. [14] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 04/15/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Arthur J. Tarnow ; Hearing Dates: Motion hearings held on 2/12/19. ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (THH) [Entered: 04/15/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dean M. Googasian for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Dean M. Googasian for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc.. Certificate of Service:04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by Dean M. Googasian. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (DMG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by George A. Googasian. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (GAG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc. by Thomas H. Howlett. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1338] (THH) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by John T. Sheets. Certificate of Service: 04/05/2019. [19-1338] (JTS) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Todd Rhys Mendel for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (TRM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by Eugene Driker. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (ED) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kurt Busch and Kurt Busch, Inc. by Todd R. Mendel. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-1338] (TRM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#4) The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-1309 AND 19-1338. [Please open original notice found on CA No. 19-1309 for important details and deadlines.] [19-1309, 19-1338] (LMR) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Sports Management Network, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less