This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/23/2022 at 06:04:00 (UTC).

Spivey v. Chitimacha Tribe

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Spivey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chitimacha Tribe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-30436

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Montie Spivey

Defendant / Appellees

Chitimacha Tribe of Louisiana

April Wyatt

Jacob Darden

Toby Darden

Jacqueline Junca

Cypress Bayou Casino & Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Huntington B. Downer Jr.

Attorney at Waitz & Downer

423 Goode Street

Houma, LA 70360-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Murphy

Attorney at Jacobson Law Group

180 E. 5Th Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101

George D. Ernest Esq. III

Attorney at Hurlburt, Monrose & Ernest

700 Saint John Street

Lafayette, LA 70501-0000

Jeffrey Kyle Holth

Attorney at Jacobson Law Group

180 E. 5Th Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101

James Nichols

Attorney at Jacobson Law Group

180 E. 5Th Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Montie Spivey [22-30436] (MCS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 12:20 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9902648-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30436] (CB) [Entered: 07/28/2022 10:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (George D. Ernest III) [Entered: 08/09/2022 11:02 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30436] (Michael Murphy ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:43 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (James Nichols ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:46 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (Jeffrey Kyle Holth ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:48 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Huntington B. Downer, Jr. for Mr. Montie Spivey for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30436] (Huntington B. Downer Jr.) [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:43 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/26/2022 for Appellant Montie Spivey. [22-30436] (CMB) [Entered: 08/15/2022 02:36 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Montie Spivey. Date of service: 09/22/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Downer; Attorney for Appellees: Ernest, Holth, Murphy, Nichols [22-30436] (Huntington B. Downer Jr.) [Entered: 09/22/2022 03:12 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Montie Spivey. Date of service: 09/22/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Downer; Attorney for Appellees: Ernest, Holth, Murphy, Nichols [22-30436] (Huntington B. Downer Jr.) [Entered: 09/22/2022 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/26/2022 for Appellant Montie Spivey. [22-30436] (CMB) [Entered: 08/15/2022 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30436] (CMB) [Entered: 08/15/2022 08:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Huntington B. Downer Jr. for Appellant Montie Spivey in 22-30436 [22-30436] (MAS) [Entered: 08/12/2022 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey Kyle Holth for party(s) Appellee Toby Darden Appellee Jacob Darden Appellee Jacqueline Junca Appellee April Wyatt Appellee Cypress Bayou Casino & Hotel Appellee Chitimacha Tribe of Louisiana, in case 22-30436 [22-30436] (MAS) [Entered: 08/12/2022 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Nichols for party(s) Appellee Toby Darden Appellee Jacob Darden Appellee Jacqueline Junca Appellee April Wyatt Appellee Cypress Bayou Casino & Hotel Appellee Chitimacha Tribe of Louisiana, in case 22-30436 [22-30436] (MAS) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Murphy for party(s) Appellee Toby Darden Appellee Jacob Darden Appellee Jacqueline Junca Appellee April Wyatt Appellee Cypress Bayou Casino & Hotel Appellee Chitimacha Tribe of Louisiana, in case 22-30436 [22-30436] (MAS) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Huntington B. Downer, Jr. for Mr. Montie Spivey for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30436] (Huntington B. Downer Jr.) [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (Jeffrey Kyle Holth ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (James Nichols ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30436] (Michael Murphy ) [Entered: 08/11/2022 09:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee Jacqueline Junca in 22-30436, Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee Toby Darden in 22-30436, Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee Jacob Darden in 22-30436, Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee April Wyatt in 22-30436, Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee Cypress Bayou Casino & Hotel in 22-30436, Attorney George D. Ernest III for Appellee Chitimacha Tribe of Louisiana in 22-30436 [22-30436] (MAS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30436] (George D. Ernest III) [Entered: 08/09/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:22-CV-491. Electronic ROA due on 08/12/2022. [22-30436] (CB) [Entered: 07/28/2022 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9902648-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30436] (CB) [Entered: 07/28/2022 10:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Montie Spivey [22-30436] (MCS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer George D Ernest, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Murphy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey K Holth