This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/06/2020 at 06:37:30 (UTC).

Speed Track, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Speed Track, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1660

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

NA TECH COMPUTER SUPPLIES INC.

BARNESANDNOBLE.COM, INC.

SYX NORTH AMERICAN TECH HOLDINGS LLC

SYSTEMAX, INC.

BARNESANDNOBLE.COM, LLC

J&R ELECTRONICS, INC.

HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company

POCAHONTAS CORP

NA TECH DIRECT, INC.

Defendant / Appellants

DELL, INC.

RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT, INC.

OVERSTOCK.COM, INC.

OFFICEMAX, INC.

EVINE LIVE, INC., dba ShopNBC.com

AMAZON.COM, INC.

MACYS.COM, LLC

B&H FOTO & ELECTRONICS CORP.

BEST BUY.COM LLC

MACY'S, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

SPEED TRACK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Alan Cederoth

Michael Berta

Carter Glasgow Phillips

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Alan Peter Block

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#25

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1573 Lead with 20-1660 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [688199] [20-1573, 20-1660] [LMN] [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER. modifying case association: 20-1573 Lead with 20-1660 Cross-Appeal. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [688195] [20-1573, 20-1660] [LMN] [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/30/2020. [684811] Entry of Appearance is due 04/21/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/21/2020. Docketing Statement is due 04/21/2020. Appellant's brief is due 06/08/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 04/07/2020 12:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less