This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/17/2020 at 06:07:38 (UTC).

Speed Track, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Speed Track, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1573

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

POCAHONTAS CORP

NA TECH DIRECT, INC.

J&R ELECTRONICS, INC.

SYX NORTH AMERICAN TECH HOLDINGS LLC

NA TECH COMPUTER SUPPLIES INC.

HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company

Defendant / Cross Appellants

MACYS.COM, LLC

B&H FOTO & ELECTRONICS CORP.

BEST BUY.COM LLC

MACY'S, INC.

DELL, INC.

OVERSTOCK.COM, INC.

OFFICEMAX, INC.

RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

EVINE LIVE, INC., fka Value Vision International, Inc., dba ShopNBC.com

Defendant / Appellees

BARNESANDNOBLE.COM, INC.

SYSTEMAX, INC.

BARNESANDNOBLE.COM, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

SPEED TRACK, INC.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Cross Appellant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Cassandra Eva Havens

Ryan Casamiquela

Michael Berta

Michael A. Berta

Nathaniel C. Love

Carter Glasgow Phillips

Robert N. Hochman

Richard Alan Cederoth

Jeffrey H. Dean Esq.

Katharine Lane Malone

Elizabeth Brannen

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Alan Peter Block

James Elroy Quigley

John Bruce Campbell

 

Court Documents

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

#44

43 #2

Exhibit A

43 #1

Motion

#42

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 49 ] filed by Appellant Speed Track, Inc.; withdrawing counsel Roderick George Dorman. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [694591] [LMN] [Entered: 05/14/2020 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Amended Entry of appearance for Alan P. Block as principal counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694570] [20-1573] [Alan Block] [Entered: 05/14/2020 01:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION of Appellant Speed Track, Inc. to withdraw counsel Roderick G. Dorman [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 05/14/2020 by email. [694568] [20-1573] [Alan Block] [Entered: 05/14/2020 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Amended Entry of appearance for Alan P. Block as principal counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694383] [20-1573] [Alan Block] [Entered: 05/13/2020 07:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION of Appellant Speed Track, Inc. to withdraw counsel Roderick G. Dorman [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 05/13/2020 by email. [694382] [20-1573] [Alan Block] [Entered: 05/13/2020 07:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Official caption revised to reflect the substitution of Cross-Appellant iMedia Brands, Inc. for Evine Live, Inc. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [691615] [LMN] [Entered: 05/01/2020 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 43 ] filed by Cross-Appellant Evine Live, Inc.; modifying the official caption. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [691614] [LMN] [Entered: 05/01/2020 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Corrected Entry of appearance for Ryan J. Casamiquela as of counsel for Cross-Appellants B&H Foto & Electronics Corp., Evine Live, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Macys.com, LLC, OfficeMax, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Recreational Equipment, Inc.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email. [691425] [20-1573] [Ryan Casamiquela] [Entered: 04/30/2020 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION of Cross-Appellant Evine Live, Inc. to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/30/2020 by email. [691373] [20-1573] [Michael Berta] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants B&H Foto & Electronics Corp., Evine Live, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Macys.com, LLC, OfficeMax, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Recreational Equipment, Inc.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email. [691365] [20-1573] [Michael Berta] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Nathaniel C. Love as of counsel for Appellees Amazon.com, Inc., Best Buy.com LLC and Dell, Inc.. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683082] [20-1573] [Nathaniel Love] [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Robert N. Hochman as of counsel for Appellees Amazon.com, Inc., Best Buy.com LLC and Dell, Inc.. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683079] [20-1573] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Carter G. Phillips as principal counsel for Appellees Amazon.com, Inc., Best Buy.com LLC and Dell, Inc.. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683075] [20-1573] [Carter Phillips] [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Alan P. Block as of counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681045] [20-1573] [Alan Block] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for James E. Quigley as of counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681043] [20-1573] [James Quigley] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Roderick G. Dorman as principal counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681038] [20-1573] [Roderick Dorman] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681037] [20-1573] [Roderick Dorman] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681035] [20-1573] [Roderick Dorman] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for John B. Campbell as of counsel for Appellant Speed Track, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681030] [20-1573] [Roderick Dorman] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/09/2020. [679691] Entry of Appearance is due 04/01/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/01/2020. Docketing Statement is due 04/01/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/18/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 03/18/2020 09:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less