Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2020 at 06:15:36 (UTC).

Southern Poverty Law Center v. DHS, et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Southern Poverty Law Center filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5257

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

Nathalie Asher, Acting Assistant Director, Field Operations for Enforcement and Removal Operations, in official capacity

Matthew T. Albence, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), in official capacity

Claire Trickler-McNulty, Acting Director U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Office of Detention Policy and Planning, in official capacity

Derek N. Benner, Acting Deputy Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in official capacity

Sean Gallagher, Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Atlanta Field Office, in official capacity

Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Trey Lund, Acting Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, in official capacity

Tae Johnson, Assistant Director for Custody Management, Enforcement & Removal Operations, in official capacity

Enrique Lucero, Assistant Director, Field Operations, Enforcement and Removal Operations, in official capacity

United States Department of Homeland Security

Tae Johnson, Acting Deputy Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in official capacity

Petter B. Berg, Assistant Director, Field Operations for Enforcement and Removal Operations, in official capacity

Thomas Giles, Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Atlanta Field Office, in official capacity

Diane Witte, Acting Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, New Orleans Field Office, in official capacity

Christopher Kelly, Acting Director U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Office of Detention Policy and Planning, in official capacity

Tony H. Pham, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), in official capacity

Enrique Lucero, Executive Associate Director, Field Operations, Enforcement and Removal Operations, in official capacity

Russell Hott, Acting Assistant Director for Custody Management, Enforcement & Removal Operations, in official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellee

Southern Poverty Law Center, in its individual capacity and on behalf of its clients detained at LaSalle ICE Processing Center, Irwin County Detention Center, and Stewart Detention Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Ruth Ann Mueller

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

David Byerley

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John Timothy Bergin

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

607 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005-2018

William E. Dorris

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

Adam Howard Charnes

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

STATEMENT [1864564] with Disclosure Listing filed by Southern Poverty Law Center [Service Date: 10/02/2020 ] [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:38 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1863520] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257]STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1863520] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:37 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1863519] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:32 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1863518] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:23 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1863517] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:18 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1863515] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:12 PM]

Open Document #2

Underlying Decision in Case Filed (Opinion)

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed (Order)

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863513] filed by David J. Byerley and co-counsel Ruth Ann Mueller on behalf of Appellants Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:53 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1863437] filed by Southern Poverty Law Center [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 09/25/2020 01:39 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863435] filed by Adam H. Charnes and co-counsel William E. Dorris on behalf of Appellee Southern Poverty Law Center. [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 09/25/2020 01:36 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1858432] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/13/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/13/2020 [20-5257] [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:51 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL [1858429] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00760-CKK-RMM filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty, DHS and Chad F. Wolf. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5257. [20-5257] [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:49 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1864564] with Disclosure Listing filed by Southern Poverty Law Center [Service Date: 10/02/2020 ] [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1863520] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257]STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1863520] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1863519] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1863518] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1863517] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1863515] filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1863514] submitted by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863513] filed by David J. Byerley and co-counsel Ruth Ann Mueller on behalf of Appellants Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, DHS, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5257] (Byerley, David) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1863437] filed by Southern Poverty Law Center [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 09/25/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863435] filed by Adam H. Charnes and co-counsel William E. Dorris on behalf of Appellee Southern Poverty Law Center. [20-5257] (Charnes, Adam) [Entered: 09/25/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1858432] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/25/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/13/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/25/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/13/2020 [20-5257] [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL [1858429] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00760-CKK-RMM filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, Derek N. Benner, Sean Gallagher, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, Enrique Lucero, Trey Lund, Claire Trickler-McNulty, DHS and Chad F. Wolf. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5257. [20-5257] [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5257] [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Matthew T. Albence, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), in official capacity is a litigant

Latest cases where CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. is a litigant