This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:25:51 (UTC).

Southern Furniture Leasing v. YRC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Southern Furniture Leasing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YRC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3262

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SOUTHERN FURNITURE LEASING, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

ROADWAY EXPRESS, INC.

YELLOW TRANSPORTATION, INC.

YRC, INC.

YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Eric David Barton I

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Tyler W. Hudson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Garrett Owens

Attorney at Price Armstrong

2226 1St Avenue South, Suite 105

Birmington, AL 35233

Nicholas W. Armstrong

Attorney at Price Armstrong

2226 1St Avenue South, Suite 105

Birmington, AL 35233

Sarah Steen Ruane

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen L. Hill Jr.

Attorney at Dentons

4520 Main Street, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64111

Jacqueline Whipple

Attorney at Dentons

4520 Main Street, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10713307] Appellant's appendix filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:45 PM]

Open Document

[10713298] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:35 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10703289] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/17/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. [19-3262] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:42 PM]

Open Document

[10703057] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric David Barton for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] [Entered: 12/17/2019 07:39 AM]

Open Document

[10702997] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:23 PM]

Open Document

[10702993] Docketing statement filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:20 PM]

Open Document

[10702745] Entry of appearance filed by Jacqueline Whipple and Stephen L. Hill, Jr.,for Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc. and Roadway Express, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3262] [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:18 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter and preliminary record

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket[10713561] Minute order filed - Appellant's brief and appendix is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Paper copies of appellant's opening brief due 02/04/2020 by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. Appellees' brief due 02/26/2020 for Yellow Transportation, Inc., Roadway Express, Inc., YRC, Inc. and YRC Worldwide, Inc. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3262] [Entered: 01/28/2020 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713307] Appellant's appendix filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713298] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10704664] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/07/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3262] [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703289] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/17/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. [19-3262] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703057] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric David Barton for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] [Entered: 12/17/2019 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket[10703045] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/24/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3262] [Entered: 12/17/2019 07:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702997] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702996] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric D. Barton for Appellant Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262]--[Edited 12/17/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] EDB [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702993] Docketing statement filed by Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc.. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] EDB [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702745] Entry of appearance filed by Jacqueline Whipple and Stephen L. Hill, Jr.,for Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc. and Roadway Express, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3262] [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702724] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen L. Hill Jr. for Appellees Roadway Express, Inc., Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc. and YRC, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3262] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 12/16/19 ] SLH [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10699241] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/02/2019 Docketing statement due 12/16/2019 for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. Transcript order form due 12/16/2019 for Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 12/16/2019 for Roadway Express, Inc., Southern Furniture Leasing, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., YRC, Inc. and Yellow Transportation, Inc. [19-3262] [Entered: 12/02/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.