This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/13/2019 at 06:08:09 (UTC).

Southcentral Foundation v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Co

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Southcentral Foundation filed an Other lawsuit against Alaska Native Tribal Health Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35423

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

SOUTHCENTRAL FOUNDATION

Defendant / Appellant

ALASKA NATIVE TRIBAL HEALTH CONSORTIUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas Fram

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Shane Kanady

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY, LLP

1031 W. Fourth Avenue, Suite 600

Anchorage, AK 99501

William D. Temko Esquire

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Louisiana Cutler Esquire

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY, LLP

1031 W. Fourth Avenue, Suite 600

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brad Spencer Daniels

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 Sw Ninth Avenue, Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Rachel C. Lee

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 Sw Ninth Avenue, Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

James Torgerson

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

510 L Street

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Cross Appeal Chart

#2

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11319929] (AD) [Entered: 06/05/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Southcentral Foundation in 19-35455 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/04/2019. [11319898] [19-35455, 19-35423] (Temko, William) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/04/2019. First cross appeal brief due 08/21/2019 for Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium. Second brief on cross appeal due 09/23/2019 for Southcentral Foundation. Third brief on cross appeal due 10/23/2019 for Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Southcentral Foundation is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11310166] [19-35455, 19-35423] (RT) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11305076] (AD) [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304925] [19-35423] (Torgerson, James) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/12/2019. Transcript due 07/12/2019. Appellant Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium opening brief due 08/21/2019. Appellee Southcentral Foundation answering brief due 09/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11297272] (RT) [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southcentral Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad S. Daniels