Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 06:08:38 (UTC).

Soroush Janamian v. Arno Arutyunyan

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Soroush Janamian filed an Other lawsuit against Arno Arutyunyan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1006

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

SOROUSH JANAMIAN

Debtor

In re: ARNO ARUTYUNYAN

Appellee

ARNO ARUTYUNYAN

Glendale, CA 91205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Bruce T. McIntosh

1055 E. Colorado Blvd.

Pasadena, CA 91106

Appellee Attorney

Arno Arutyunyan

416 Porter Street

Glendale, CA 91205

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Sent Notice of Mandatory Attorney Electronic Filing form to Attorney Bruce T. McIntosh for Appellant Soroush Janamian with note that no further paper filings will be accepted. (CLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 08:49 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed order (FARIS); Motion to extend time to file appellant's opening brief filed by Bruce T. McIntosh is GRANTED. Appellant Soroush Janamian's opening brief due 04/24/2020.;. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:56 PM]

5 #3

Proposed order

5 #2

Declartion of Bruce T. Mcintosh in support of extension of time

5 #1

Motion for extension of time

#4

(#4) CLERK'S ORDER (SMS) ; re transcripts notice. By MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020, appellant must comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(b)(1). (CLS) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:56 AM]

#3

(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the designation of contents for inclusion. filed in Bk. Ct. 01/22/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:35 PM]

2 #5

BAP Rules

2 #4

E-Filing Administrative Order

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

#2

Briefing Order

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

1 #2

Notice of Referral

#1

Notice of Appeal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Sent Notice of Mandatory Attorney Electronic Filing form to Attorney Bruce T. McIntosh for Appellant Soroush Janamian with note that no further paper filings will be accepted. (CLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order (FARIS); Motion to extend time to file appellant's opening brief filed by Bruce T. McIntosh is GRANTED. Appellant Soroush Janamian's opening brief due 04/24/2020.;. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed original of Attorney Bruce T. McIntosh for Appellant Soroush Janamian's motion extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 04/24/2020; served on 02/24/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S ORDER (SMS) ; re transcripts notice. By MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020, appellant must comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(b)(1). (CLS) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the designation of contents for inclusion. filed in Bk. Ct. 01/22/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Soroush Janamian. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Soroush Janamian's opening brief due 02/24/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 01/08/2020, notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less