This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:00:40 (UTC).

Sorkpor v. The Harlo Fenway

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Sorkpor filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against The Harlo Fenway. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2142

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM H. SORKPOR

Boston, MA 02215

Defendant / Appellee

HARLO FENWAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William H. Sorkpor

Po Box 15235

Boston, MA 02215

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James M. Hlawek

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2 Seaport Ln, Ste 300

Boston, MA 02210-1800

Michael David Fleischer

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2 Seaport Ln, Ste 300

Boston, MA 02210-1800

Minh N. Vu

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Harlo Fenway filed by Attorney Minh N. Vu. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2019. [19-2142] (MNV) [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT CORRECTIONS filed by Appellant William H. Sorkpor. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/27/2019 10:54 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT order acknowledgment filed by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:23 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 12/20/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Minh N. Vu for Harlo Fenway. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Harlo Fenway filed by Attorney James M. Hlawek. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-2142] (JMH) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow: 10/08/2019, Summary Judgment. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Harlo Fenway filed by Attorney Minh N. Vu. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2019. [19-2142] (MNV) [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT CORRECTIONS filed by Appellant William H. Sorkpor. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/27/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT order acknowledgment filed by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 12/20/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Minh N. Vu for Harlo Fenway. [19-2142] (GRC) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant William H. Sorkpor indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 10/08/2019, Summary Judgment. Transcript(s) due 01/17/2020 from Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-2142] (KPC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Harlo Fenway filed by Attorney James M. Hlawek. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-2142] (JMH) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant William H. Sorkpor was granted in the district court by order dated 11/06/2019. [19-2142] (KPC) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellant William H. Sorkpor. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/26/2019. [19-2142] (KPC) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less