This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/23/2019 at 06:05:00 (UTC).

Soo Line Railroad Company v. Consolidated Rail Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Soo Line Railroad Company filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Consolidated Rail Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3100

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION

JOHN HART

INDIANA HARBOR BELT RAILROAD COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY, doing business as CANADIAN PACIFIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth J. Munson

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLC

111 Monument Circle

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Theodore R. Boehm

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLC

111 Monument Circle

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

A. Richard Musgrove Blaiklock

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER, LLP

501 Indiana Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46202-6150

Chad M. Clamage

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

71 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Evan M. Tager

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

1999 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Nancy J. Townsend

Attorney at KRIEG DEVAULT LLP

8001 Broadway

Merrillville, IN 46410

Lawrence Adelson

Attorney at CHICO & NUNES, P.C.

333 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David C. Jensen

Attorney at EICHHORN & EICHHORN, LLP

2929 Carlson Drive, P.O. Box 2275

Hammond, IN 46323-0000

David F. Rifkind Esq.

Attorney at STINSON LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Douglas R. Dalgleish

Attorney at STINSON LLP

1201 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106-2150

Andrew W. Davis

Attorney at STINSON LLP

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Benjamin D. Eastburn

Attorney at STINSON LLP

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney David F. Rifkind, Esq. for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [27] [7051250] [19-3100] (LJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Honorable Theodore R. Boehm for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [26] [7051162] [19-3100] (LJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. Lawrence Adelson for Appellee Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [25] [7051153] [19-3100] (LJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 09:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/16/2020 for Soo Line Railroad Company. Appellees' briefs due on or before 02/18/2020 for CSX Transportation, Inc., Consolidated Rail Corporation, John Hart, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/10/2020 for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. RJS [7043760] [19-3100] (VG) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David F. Rifkind for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [23] [7043386] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100]--[Edited 11/13/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Rifkind, David) [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Douglas R. Dalgleish for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [22] [7042855] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100] (Dalgleish, Douglas) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin Eastburn for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [21] [7042826] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100] (Eastburn, Benjamin) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew W. Davis for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [20] [7042822] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100] (Davis, Andrew) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David C. Jensen for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [19] [7042744] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100] (Jensen, David) [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nancy J. Townsend for Terry Evans, John Hart, Mike Pendergrass and Tom Werner. [18] [7042138] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100] (Townsend, Nancy) [Entered: 11/06/2019 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin Eastburn for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [10] [7040440] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100]--[Edited 10/31/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Eastburn, Benjamin) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2019 for Soo Line Railroad Company. Appellees' briefs due on or before 01/15/2020 for CSX Transportation, Inc., Consolidated Rail Corporation, John Hart, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/05/2020 for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company RJS [7040434] [19-3100] (CG) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appearance form filed by Attorney Douglas R. Dalgleish for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [8] [7040428] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100]--[Edited 10/31/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Dalgleish, Douglas) [Entered: 10/30/2019 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday November 14, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [7] [7040424] [19-3100] (CG) [Entered: 10/30/2019 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7040153] [19-3100] (Davis, Andrew) [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew W. Davis for Appellant Soo Line Railroad Company. [5] [7039961] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3100]--[Edited 10/29/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Davis is added to the docket.] (Davis, Andrew) [Entered: 10/29/2019 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the date(s) of consent of all the parties to this litigation. The statement is due on or before November 4, 2019. (See order for further details) DW [4] [7039628] [19-3100] (PS) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellees brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7039626] [3] [7039626] [19-3100] (PS) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Terry Evans, Mike Pendergrass, Tom Werner, CSX Corporation and Norfolk Southern Corporation. [2] [7039055] [19-3100] (ER) [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/07/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/03/2019 for Soo Line Railroad Company. [1] [7039054] [19-3100] (ER) [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Consolidated Rail Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific Railway is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant