This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/26/2022 at 06:07:52 (UTC).

Sony Music Entertainment v. Cox Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Sony Music Entertainment filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cox Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1451

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT

ARISTA MUSIC

ARISTA RECORDS, LLC

LAFACE RECORDS LLC

PROVIDENT LABEL GROUP, LLC

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT US LATIN LLC

VOLCANO ENTERTAINMENT III, LLC

ZOMBA RECORDINGS LLC

SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING LLC

EMI AI GALLICO MUSIC CORP.

EMI ALGEE MUSIC CORP.

EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.

EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.

COLGEMS-EMI MUSIC INC.

EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC., d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music

EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., d/b/a EMI Longitude Music

EMI FEIST CATALOG INC.

EMI MILLER CATALOG INC.

EMI MILLS MUSIC, INC.

EMI UNART CATALOG INC.

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Alexander Zebrak

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20016

Catherine Emily Stetson

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Patrick Cannon Valencia

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Other Attorneys

Michael S. Elkin

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Jennifer A. Golinveaux

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jon Tyler McGaughey

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

1901 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Christopher J. Cariello

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE, LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

E. Joshua Rosenkranz

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE, LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Andrew E. Tauber

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

1901 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for abeyance [ # 18 ] Case 22-1451 placed in abeyance pending decision in 21-1168 from current appellate court.; and administratively terminating Motion to extend filing time [ # 18 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001174354] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 06/07/2022 04:22 PM]

#23

(#23) ORDER filed suspending briefing. Copies to all parties. [1001173931] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 06/07/2022 12:09 PM]

#22

(#22) REPLY by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC to [ # 18 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 21 ].. [1001173775] [22-1451] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 06/07/2022 10:44 AM]

#21

(#21) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC to [ # 18 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 19 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001173487] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:51 PM]

#20

(#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick C. Valencia for Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. [1001173198] [22-1451] Patrick Valencia [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:00 PM]

#19

(#19) NOTICE ISSUED to Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corporation, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC requesting response to motion for abeyance [ # 18 ]. Response due 06/06/2022.[1001169681]. [22-1451] TW [Entered: 05/27/2022 04:14 PM]

#18

(#18) MOTION by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC to place case in abeyance. , to extend filing time for opening brief if Abeyance is denied, until August 22, 2022 or 30 days after the panel decision in the Principal Appeal issues, whichever is sooner... Date and method of service: 05/27/2022 ecf. [1001169568] [22-1451] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:48 PM]

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc. and Songs of Universal, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001161117] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/11/2022 08:03 PM]

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bad Boys Records LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001161116] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/11/2022 07:59 PM]

#10

(#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/21/2022. Response Brief due 07/20/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001160875] [22-1451] CB [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:01 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Tauber for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160760] [22-1451] Andrew Tauber [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:22 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer A. Golinveaux for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160757] [22-1451] Jennifer Golinveaux [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:19 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael S. Elkin for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160756] [22-1451] Michael Elkin [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:16 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001160752] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:09 PM]

#5

(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC.. [1001160751] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:07 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Tyler McGaughey for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160748] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:05 PM]

#3

(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA.. [1001152893] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:18 AM]

#2

(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA.. [1001152893] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:18 AM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for abeyance [ # 18 ] Case 22-1451 placed in abeyance pending decision in 21-1168 from current appellate court.; and administratively terminating Motion to extend filing time [ # 18 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001174354] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 06/07/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER filed suspending briefing. Copies to all parties. [1001173931] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 06/07/2022 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC to [ # 18 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 21 ].. [1001173775] [22-1451] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 06/07/2022 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC to [ # 18 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 19 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001173487] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick C. Valencia for Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. [1001173198] [22-1451] Patrick Valencia [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE ISSUED to Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corporation, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC requesting response to motion for abeyance [ # 18 ]. Response due 06/06/2022.[1001169681]. [22-1451] TW [Entered: 05/27/2022 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC to place case in abeyance. , to extend filing time for opening brief if Abeyance is denied, until August 22, 2022 or 30 days after the panel decision in the Principal Appeal issues, whichever is sooner... Date and method of service: 05/27/2022 ecf. [1001169568] [22-1451] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc. and Songs of Universal, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001161117] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/11/2022 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bad Boys Records LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001161116] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/11/2022 07:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sony Music Entertainment, Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Laface Records LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Stone Agate Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated and Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001161115] [22-1451] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/11/2022 07:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Joshua Rosenkranz for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160979] [22-1451] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/21/2022. Response Brief due 07/20/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001160875] [22-1451] CB [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Tauber for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160760] [22-1451] Andrew Tauber [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer A. Golinveaux for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160757] [22-1451] Jennifer Golinveaux [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael S. Elkin for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160756] [22-1451] Michael Elkin [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001160752] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC.. [1001160751] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Tyler McGaughey for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1001160748] [22-1451] Jon McGaughey [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA.. [1001152893] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA. Case manager: RachelLee. [1001152883] [22-1451] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMI Mills Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZOMBA RECORDING LLC is a litigant