This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2022 at 06:23:05 (UTC).

Sony Music Entertainment v. Cox Communications, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Sony Music Entertainment filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cox Communications, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1168

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

EMI FEIST CATALOG INC.

ROADRUNNER RECORDS, INC.

FUELED BY RAMEN LLC

ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION

EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC., d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music

EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT US LATIN LLC

ARISTA RECORDS, LLC

STONE DIAMOND MUSIC CORP.

STONE AGATE MUSIC

COTILLION MUSIC, INCORPORATED

WB MUSIC CORPORATION

JOBETE MUSIC COMPANY, INCORPORATED

RIGHTSONG MUSIC INC.

ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED

WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORPORATION

EMI UNART CATALOG INC.

ARISTA MUSIC

SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING LLC

Defendant / Appellant

COXCOM, LLC

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Catherine Emily Stetson

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Scott Alexander Zebrak

Attorney at OPPENHEIM & ZEBRAK, LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas Matthew Buchanan

1901 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Brian Philip Goldman

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Geoffrey Paul Eaton Esq.

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

1901 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Michael S. Elkin

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

E. Joshua Rosenkranz

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE, LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Christopher J. Cariello

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE, LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Jennifer A. Golinveaux

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Megan Leef Brown

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Samuel J. Zeitlin

Attorney at DURIE TANGRI LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kevin G. Rupy

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Andrew L. Deutsch

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-0000

Corynne McSherry

Attorney at ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION

815 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Phillip Robert Malone

Attorney at STANFORD UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305-8610

Mitchell Leff Stoltz

Attorney at ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION

815 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Adrienne Kosak

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Ari Scott Meltzer

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Joseph Charles Gratz

Attorney at DURIE TANGRI LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Edison Weslow

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#85

RESTRICTED

#84

RESTRICTED

#83

RESTRICTED

#82

RESTRICTED

#81

RESTRICTED

#80

RESTRICTED

#79

(#79) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/09/2022. Session Starting Time: 2:00 pm. Your case is currently first on the afternoon docket, and your check-in time if appearing in person is 1:30 pm. Forms due within 7 calendar days. [1001104408] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:14 AM]

#77

(#77) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the March 8-11, 2022 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of Copyright Alliance Amicus brief within 7 days Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/14/2022. [1001088124] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:22 AM]

#75

(#75) CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR. [1001076571] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 12/16/2021 06:37 PM]

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket(#86) ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Pamela A. Harris, Allison J. Rushing and Henry F. Floyd. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. E. Joshua Rosenkranz for Appellants Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC and Ms. Catherine Emily Stetson for Appellees Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Stone Agate Music, Arista Records, LLC, Universal Music Corporation, WB Music Corporation, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Laface Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Arista Music, Provident Label Group, LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Bad Boys Records LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc. and W.C.M. Music Corp.. Courtroom Deputy: Sarah Carr. [1001124708] [21-1168] SCC [Entered: 03/09/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Certification of compliance with argument protocol by Sony Music Entertainment, Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. Certification of compliance uploaded for Matthew J. Oppenheim. [1001110066] [21-1168] Matthew Oppenheim [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Certification of compliance with argument protocol by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music -MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corporation, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. Certification of compliance uploaded for Catherine E. Stetson. [1001108450] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 02/10/2022 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT (restricted access) by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, EMI AI Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Publishing Limited, Universal/Island Music Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corporation, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. Counsel arguing: Catherine E. Stetson. Answering argument time: 20 minutes. [1001108447] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 02/10/2022 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Certification of compliance with argument protocol by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Certification of compliance uploaded for Christopher J. Cariello. [1001108012] [21-1168] Christopher Cariello [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Certification of compliance with argument protocol by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Certification of compliance uploaded for E. Joshua Rosenkranz. [1001108006] [21-1168] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT (restricted access) by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Counsel arguing: E. Joshua Rosenkranz. Opening argument time: 15 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes. [1001108000] [21-1168] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/09/2022. Session Starting Time: 2:00 pm. Your case is currently first on the afternoon docket, and your check-in time if appearing in person is 1:30 pm. Forms due within 7 calendar days. [1001104408] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the March 8-11, 2022 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of Copyright Alliance Amicus brief within 7 days Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/14/2022. [1001088124] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR. [1001076571] [21-1168] JLC [Entered: 12/16/2021 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Rightsong Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated and Intersong U.S.A., Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000908840] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 03/02/2021 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bad Boys Records LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000908832] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sony Music Entertainment, Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Laface Records LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recordings LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Stone Agate Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated and Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000908831] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Catherine E. Stetson for Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boys Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Company, Incorporated, Laface Records LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Incorporated, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Unichappell Music, Incorporated, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, WB Music Corporation and Zomba Recordings LLC. [1000908830] [21-1168] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [21-1168] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000908507] [21-1168] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian P. Goldman for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1000900182] [21-1168] Brian Goldman [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher J. Cariello for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1000900169] [21-1168] Christopher Cariello [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Joshua Rosenkranz for Cox Communications, Incorporated and CoxCom, LLC. [1000900163] [21-1168] E. Rosenkranz [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00950-LO-JFA. Case manager: JMoore. [21-1168] JHM [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIGHTSONG MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FUELED BY RAMEN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc. is a litigant