This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 06:10:11 (UTC).

Sonic Industries, et al v. Simple Tie Ventures, et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Sonic Industries filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Simple Tie Ventures. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6120

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICA'S DRIVE-IN BRAND PROPERTIES LLC, a Kansas limited liability company

SONIC INDUSTRIES LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

SONIC INDUSTRIES SERVICES INC., an Oklahoma corporation

Defendants

SIMPLE TIE VENTURES, LP

THOMAS P. SCURRIA

DONALD R. WELSH

Counter Claimants

WILLOW GROVE RESTCO, LP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership

MONT2, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company

LANCFOUR, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company

THOMAS P. SCURRIA, an individual

DRUMORE RESTCO, LP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership

BERKSONE, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company

CROSS RESTCO, LP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership

DJTM, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company

OX RESTCO, LP, a Pennsylvania limited limited partnership

SIMPLE TIE VENTURES, LP, a limited partnership

BERKSTWO, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company

JEFFREY B. SOLOMON, an individual

DONALD R. WELSH, an individual

3Rd Party Defendant

SONIC RESTAURANTS, INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Jo Pierce

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce

210 Park Avenue, Suite 2700, Oklahoma Tower

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joe M. Hampton

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce

210 Park Avenue, Suite 2700, Oklahoma Tower

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John F. Verhey

Attorney at DLA Piper

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Russell C. Lissuzzo III

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

Two Leadership Square, 211 N. Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael Avery

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

Two Leadership Square, 211 N. Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Zachary A.P. Oubre

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

Two Leadership Square, 211 N. Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10775062] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 11/12/2020 for Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #4

Ex. 3 - August 27, 2020 Saroch Declaration

Open Document #3

Ex. 2 - March 13, 2020 Saroch Declaration

Open Document #2

Ex. 1 - Order Granting Prelim Injunction

Open Document #1

Appellees' Amended Response to Motion to Stay

Open Document

[10773843] Appellees' response to Appellants' motion for stay of district court's preliminary injunction filed by America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc.. Served on: 09/25/2020. Manner of service: email. --[Edited 09/25/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text][20-6120] JMH [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:46 PM]

Open Document

[10773460] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Russell C. Lissuzzo, III, for Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Schaum's Restco, LP, Cross Restco, LP, Tanger Restco, LP, Willow Grove Restco, LP, Limerick Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Drumore Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Lancone, LLC, Berksone, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Lancfour, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, DJTM, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Chestone, LLC, Maribou, LLC and Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria and Jeffrey B. Solomon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:13 PM]

Open Document

[10772217] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Notice of appearance past due for Russell C. Lissuzzo, III. Notice of appearance due on 09/25/2020 for Simple Tie Ventures, LP [20-6120] [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:19 AM]

Open Document

[10771804] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellees to file a response to Appellants' motion for stay of district court's preliminary injunction. Response due by 10/01/2020 for America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc. Served on 09/21/2020. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:48 AM]

Open Document

[10766750] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joe M. Hampton and Ms. Amy Jo Pierce for Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc., America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC and Sonic Restaurants, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed have been previously disclosed to the court. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:49 PM]

Open Document

[10766493] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/31/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/13/2020 for Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. [20-6120] [Entered: 08/31/2020 07:57 AM]

Open Document

[10766374] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Avery and and Mr. Zachary A.P. Oubre for Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Schaum's Restco, LP, Cross Restco, LP, Tanger Restco, LP, Willow Grove Restco, LP, Limerick Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Drumore Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Lancone, LLC, Berksone, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Lancfour, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, DJTM, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Chestone, LLC, and Maribou, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed are counsel in case. Served on 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] --[Edited to condense docket text 09/17/2020 by SLS.] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:11 PM]

Open Document

[10766335] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. Transcript ordered: Served on: 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] MA [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:15 PM]

Open Document

[10766334] Docketing statement filed by Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. Served on 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] MA [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:14 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10775062] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 11/12/2020 for Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10775027] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 1:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-6120] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10773906] Response filed by America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc. to Appellants' Motion to Stay (this Response is Amended to Include Omitted Exhibits). Served on 09/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6120] JMH [Entered: 09/26/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10773843] Appellees' response to Appellants' motion for stay of district court's preliminary injunction filed by America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc.. Served on: 09/25/2020. Manner of service: email. --[Edited 09/25/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text][20-6120] JMH [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10773460] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Russell C. Lissuzzo, III, for Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Schaum's Restco, LP, Cross Restco, LP, Tanger Restco, LP, Willow Grove Restco, LP, Limerick Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Drumore Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Lancone, LLC, Berksone, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Lancfour, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, DJTM, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Chestone, LLC, Maribou, LLC and Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria and Jeffrey B. Solomon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket[10773428] Entry of appearance submitted by Russell C. Lissuzzo for Appellants Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120]--[Edited 09/24/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] RCL [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10772217] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Notice of appearance past due for Russell C. Lissuzzo, III. Notice of appearance due on 09/25/2020 for Simple Tie Ventures, LP [20-6120] [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771804] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellees to file a response to Appellants' motion for stay of district court's preliminary injunction. Response due by 10/01/2020 for America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc. Served on 09/21/2020. [20-6120] [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket[10771309] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 09/21/2020 by Russell C. Lissuzzo, III for Appellants Simple Tie Ventures, LP, et al. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6120] [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771299] Motion filed by Appellants Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP for stay of of District Court's Preliminary Injunction. Served on: 09/17/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6120] MA [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket[10767876] Entry of appearance submitted by John F. Verhey for Appellees America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc. and Not Party Sonic Restaurants, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] --[Edited 09/03/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JFV [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766750] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joe M. Hampton and Ms. Amy Jo Pierce for Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc., America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC and Sonic Restaurants, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed have been previously disclosed to the court. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket[10766706] Entry of appearance submitted by Amy J. Pierce and Joe M. Hampton for Appellees America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc. and Not Party Sonic Restaurants, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120]--[Edited 08/31/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/31/20.] AJP [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766493] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/31/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/13/2020 for Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. [20-6120] [Entered: 08/31/2020 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766374] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Avery and and Mr. Zachary A.P. Oubre for Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Thomas P. Scurria, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Schaum's Restco, LP, Cross Restco, LP, Tanger Restco, LP, Willow Grove Restco, LP, Limerick Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Drumore Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Lancone, LLC, Berksone, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Lancfour, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, DJTM, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Chestone, LLC, and Maribou, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed are counsel in case. Served on 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] --[Edited to condense docket text 09/17/2020 by SLS.] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket[10766338] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/04/2020 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6120] [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766335] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. Transcript ordered: Served on: 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] MA [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766334] Docketing statement filed by Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. Served on 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120] MA [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket[10766333] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael K. Avery and Zachary A.P. Oubre for Appellants Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh, Willow Grove Restco, LP and Not Parties Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon and Donald R. Welsh for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6120]--[Edited 08/28/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/28/20.] MA [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10763233] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/17/2020. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 08/31/2020 for Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. Notice of appearance due on 08/31/2020 for America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Berksone, LLC, Berkstwo, LLC, Chestone, LLC, Cross Restco, LP, DJTM, LLC, Drumore Restco, LP, Exeter Restco, LP, Lancfour, LLC, Lancone, LLC, Lancthree, LLC, Lanctwo, LLC, Limerick Restco, LP, MADK, LP, Maribou, LLC, Mont1, LLC, Mont2, LLC, Mont3, LLC, Ox Restco, LP, Rapho Restco, LP, Schaum's Restco, LP, Thomas P. Scurria, Simple Tie Ventures, LP, Jeffrey B. Solomon, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc., Sonic Restaurants, Inc., Tanger Restco, LP, Upland Restco, LP, Donald R. Welsh and Willow Grove Restco, LP. [20-6120] [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonic Restaurants Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Verhey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Jo Pierce