This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/06/2021 at 06:25:55 (UTC).

Sobner Felix v. Key Largo Management Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Sobner Felix filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Key Largo Management Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10381

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

KEY LARGO MANAGEMENT CORP., a.k.a. Ocean PR, Inc

Plaintiff / Appellant

SOBNER FELIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen Madigan Deskins

Attorney at Ocean Properties, Ltd.

1611 W Platt St

Tampa, FL 33606

Catherine Hope Molloy

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900, Bank Of America Plaza

Tampa, FL 33602-3925

Joseph Picone

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900, Bank Of America Plaza

Tampa, FL 33602-3925

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Martin Eric Leach

Attorney at Feiler & Leach, PL

901 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134-3009

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Catherine Hope Molloy for Appellee Key Largo Management Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10381] (ECF: Catherine Molloy) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph H. Picone for Key Largo Management Corp. [21-10381] (ECF: Joseph Picone) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Catherine Hope Molloy for Key Largo Management Corp.. [21-10381] (ECF: Catherine Molloy) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:41 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Martin Eric Leach for Appellant Sobner Felix. [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/11/2021 10:20 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:00 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 02/05/2021 as to Appellant Sobner Felix. [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:02 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Martin Eric Leach for Appellant Sobner Felix. No hearings. [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:00 PM]

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

Order on Motion for Summary Judgment doc#73

Open Document #2

Judgment doc#74

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Catherine Hope Molloy for Appellee Key Largo Management Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10381] (ECF: Catherine Molloy) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph H. Picone for Key Largo Management Corp. [21-10381] (ECF: Joseph Picone) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Catherine Hope Molloy for Key Largo Management Corp.. [21-10381] (ECF: Catherine Molloy) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 03/01/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Martin Eric Leach for Appellant Sobner Felix. [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/11/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [21-10381] (ECF: Martin Leach) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 02/05/2021 as to Appellant Sobner Felix. [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Martin Eric Leach for Appellant Sobner Felix. No hearings. [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sobner Felix on 02/05/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/17/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2021 as to Appellant Sobner Felix. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/05/2021 as to Appellee Key Largo Management Corp. [Entered: 02/05/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Eric Leach