This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2021 at 06:50:53 (UTC).

Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2016 Snyder filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Acord Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-1215

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation

THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group

ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation

ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation

ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown

SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation

SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation

VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange

AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation

NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation

SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation

Plaintiff / Appellants

TOMMY MEYER

KENNETH DALE YODER

JANET KOCH

IAN SIEMPLENSKI

113 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bradley L. Snyder

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress

155 East Broad Street, 12Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Jeremy Andrew Moseley

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.

Attorney at Lambdin & Chaney

4949 South Syracuse Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80237

Thomas John Lyons

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Randall A. Hack

Attorney at Locke Lord

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Kyle W. Brenton

Attorney at Childs McCune

821 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Other Attorneys

Casie D. Collignon Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Sara Z. Moghadam

Attorney at DLA Piper

500 8Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Charles Edmond Fuller

Attorney at Senn Visciano Canges

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80203

Rodger L. Eckelberry

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

65 East State Street, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215-4260

Jacob C. Cohn

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard Mancino

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Raul A. Cuervo

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt

100 S. E. Second Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Rand L. McClellan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

65 East State Street, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215-4260

Michael S. McCarthy

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

John D. Mereness

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Robert Zupkus

Attorney at Zupkus & Angell

789 Sherman Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80203

Gregory Giometti

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Cynthia Mitchell

Attorney at Shoemaker Ghiselli & Schwartz

1811 Pearl Street

Boulder, CO 80302

Michael P. Kenny

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 West Peachtree Street, Suite 4200

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

83 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

327 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10526767] Supreme Court order dated 01/08/2018 denying certiorari filed by Dale Snyder in 16-1111 & 16-1215. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 01/08/2018 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10519147] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Robert A. Zupkus' motion to withdraw as attorney for Secura. Served on 12/06/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 12/06/2017 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10519135] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Robert A. Zupkus' motion to withdraw as counsel for Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company in this appeal. Muliha A. Khan will remain as counsel for FAMIC. Served on 12/06/2017. [16-1215] [Entered: 12/06/2017 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10519078] Motion filed by Appellee Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1215, 16-1111 for attorney Robert A. Zupkus Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellees Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company and Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1215, Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellee Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1111 to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 12/05/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] MAK [Entered: 12/05/2017 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10519077] Motion filed by Appellee Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Robert A. Zupkus Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellees Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company and Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 12/05/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215] MAK [Entered: 12/05/2017 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10509489] Supreme Court order dated 10/30/2017 denying the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by Dale Snyder, et al. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 10/30/2017 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10494615] Petition for writ of certiorari filed by Dale Snyder on 08/24/2017. Supreme Court Number 17-309. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSanction paid by Josue David Hernandez in 16-1111, 16-1215. Amount: $ 500.00 [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/13/2017 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10479888] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz admonishing and imposing a sanction as to Attorney Josue D. Hernandez consisting of a monetary sanction in the amount of $500.00. This monetary sanction is Mr. Hernandez's personal responsibility and is due 07/17/2017. See order for additional details and instructions. This order shall supplement the court's mandate issued 5/26/17. Served on 07/03/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/03/2017 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Docket[10475760] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: Lawrence D. Stone, Dufford & Brown, PC, 1700 Broadway, Ste 2100, Denver, CO 80290-2101. Reason Returned: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward. Document Returned: 6/14/17 Order. Action Taken: None. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
230 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10376018] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Mark W. Bayer for Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/07/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/07/2016 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10376005] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Mark W. Bayer for Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc.. [16-1215] MWB [Entered: 06/07/2016 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Docket[10375997] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark W. Bayer for Appellees Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc. in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/07/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111]--[Edited 06/07/2016 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 6/7/16.] MWB [Entered: 06/07/2016 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10375240] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111 to consolidate appeals. Served on: 06/03/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/03/2016 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10374325] Notice of appearance filed by Richard Mancino for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10374322] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Ty Gee, Esq. for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10374315] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Ty Gee, Esq. for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. [16-1215] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Docket[10374312] Notice of appearance submitted by Richard William Mancino for Appellee Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/01/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/1/16][16-1215] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Docket[10374309] Notice of appearance submitted by Ty Gee for Appellee Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/01/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/1/2016] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10372756] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/26/2016. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/09/2016 for Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2016 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mututal Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Corporation, Markel Insurance Company, Mckinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. [16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2016 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCECOMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant