This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2023 at 23:40:59 (UTC).

Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Snyder, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Acord Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1112

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation

ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation

ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown

SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation

SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation

VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange

AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation

CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies

Plaintiff / Appellants

TOMMY MEYER

KENNETH DALE YODER

JANET KOCH

IAN SIEMPLENSKI

116 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen

Casie D. Collignon Esq.

Terence M. Ridley Esq.

Randall A. Hack

Joel A. Glover

Mark L. Hanover

Erin F. Frohardt

Jason D. Krueger

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Josue David Hernandez

Other Attorneys

Bradley L. Snyder

Eric B. Liebman

Thomas H. Falivene

Jon Sands

Cynthia Mitchell

Sara Z. Moghadam

Mark Alan Johnson

69 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Order Judgment Cover Letter

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #15

Exhibit 14

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

205 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10740432] Mandate issued. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10734739] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Phillips, author; Baldock and Kelly. Mandate to issue. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/22/2020 09:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10715162] Notice filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Served on 02/03/2020 by email. [19-1112] MSM [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678965] Appellants' corrected reply brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Hard copies: 7. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678963] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on Appellants' Motion to Correct Appellants' Reply Brief Pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 27.5(A)(2), in which Appellants request leave to file the corrected reply brief they attach to their motion. Appellees have filed a response stating that they do not oppose the motion. Upon consideration, the court grants Appellant's unopposed motion. The corrected reply brief attached to Appellants' 09/10/20109 motion as Exhibit 2 shall be filed. Appellants shall file 7 hard copies of the corrected reply brief within 2 business days - 09/19/2019 - per 10th Cir. R. 31.5. Served on 09/17/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678857] Response filed by Electric Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association and USAA Casualty Insurance Company to Motion To Correct Appellants' Reply Brief Pursuant To 10th Cir.R. 27.5(a)(2). Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 09/16/2019 05:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677308] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on appellants' Motion to Correct Appellants' Reply Brief Pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 27.5(A)(2), in which appellants request leave to file the corrected reply brief they attached to their motion as Exhibit B. Appellants state that they have asked the appellees for their position on the relief appellants request, but appellees have not provided their position. Upon consideration, the court directs appellees to file - on or before 09/17/2019 - a response to appellants' motion. Failure to timely respond will be deemed consent to the court's acceptance and filing of the corrected reply brief appellants attached to their motion as Exhibit B. Served on 09/10/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677171] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue David Hernandez to file corrected/substitute brief. Served on: 09/10/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 09/10/2019 07:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677150] Notice filed by Electric Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association and USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Served on 09/09/2019 by email. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket as the appellants' corrected reply brief was filed on 09/17/2019 pursuant to the court's 09/17/2019 order. [AT] [10676448] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue D. Hernandez. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10639751] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, JOSUE DAVID HERNANDEZ for stay of This is a 10th Cir. R. 8.3 application to a single judge, JUDGE SCOTT M. MATHESON, JR., seeking stay of execution of the Attorneys' Fees Judgements, Docs. 621 and 633, in the district court. We are also requesting an injunction to that effect.. Served on: 04/09/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docket[10639735] Entry of appearance submitted by Josue David Hernandez for Appellants Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Marilyn Snyder and Dale SnyderJosue David Hernandez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] --[Edited 04/09/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 4/9/2019] JDH [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10639578] Notice of non-participation filed by William J. Kelly III, Chanda M. Feldkamp, Shannon M. Bell for COUNTRY Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] WJK [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10639278] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alan Epstein and Ms. Lisa F. Mickley for American Automobile Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Natiional Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docket[10639245] Entry of appearance submitted by Lisa F. Mickley and Alan Epstein for Appellees Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 04/05/2019 by NA] LFM [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10638368] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark F. Horning for ACORD Corporation. Date of Service: 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MFH [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10637402] Notice of non-participation filed by Larry S. McClung for Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] LSM [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10637129] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark W. Bayer for Verisk Analytics, Inc., Insurance Services Office, Inc.. Date of Service: 03/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MWB [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10636810] Notice of non-participation filed by Bennett Cohen for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 03/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] BLC [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10636564] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/28/2019. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 04/11/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Transcript order form due 04/11/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Notice of appearance due on 04/11/2019 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Louise Creager, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Mary Ann Geldreich, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Mary Harrow, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Janet Koch, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Tommy Meyer, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property & Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Catherine Taylor, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Insurance Group, Inc., United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Laila Saeda Urban, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI.--[Edited 03/28/2019 by LAB to attach preliminary record from district court.] [19-1112] [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less