This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2021 at 06:13:01 (UTC).

Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, et al v. Attorney General New Jersey, et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Smith Wesson Brands Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Attorney General New Jersey. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2492

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SMITH & WESSON BRANDS INC

SMITH & WESSON SALES CO

SMITH & WESSON INC

Defendant / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL NEW JERSEY

NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Amanda L. Camelotto Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1555 Zion Road, Suite 202

Northfield, NJ 08225

William J. Diggs Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1555 Zion Road, Suite 202

Northfield, NJ 08225

Courtney G. Saleski Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 5000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Christopher M. Strongosky Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert J. McGuire Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

 

Court Documents

#40

#37

#36

#32

#31

#30

#27

#24

#23

#22

21 #2

Joint Appendix Volume I of II

21 #1

Opening Brief (excluding Direct Criminal Cases)

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#41) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, Smith & Wesson Inc and Smith & Wesson Sales Co - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (RM) [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, Smith & Wesson Inc and Smith & Wesson Sales Co. Certificate of Service dated 10/01/2021 by ECF. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 10/01/2021 11:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#39) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1. Received: 5. (EMA) [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#38) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Motion for leave to file supplemental appendix received from Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs. (MS) [Entered: 09/30/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs to supplement the appendix. Certificate of Service dated 09/22/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-2492] (RJM) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Robert J. McGuire, Esq. for Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs to submit 4 hard copies in WHITE covers for the Supplemental Appendix filed on 9/24/21. Due on or before 10/04/2021. NOTE: Hard copies received were in RED. (EAF) [Entered: 09/29/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#35) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 [NONCOMPLIANT] (EAF) [Entered: 09/29/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#34) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs - Brief. Copies: 7. Received: 8. (KEL) [Entered: 09/29/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#33) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Robert J. McGuire, Esq. for Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs to file a motion for leave to file supplemental appendix. Due on or before 09/30/2021. (MS) [Entered: 09/27/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX on behalf of Appellees Attorney General New Jersey and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs. Certificate of service dated 09/24/2021 by ECF. [21-2492] (RJM) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, Smith & Wesson Inc and Smith & Wesson Sales Co for injunction. Certificate of Service dated 08/10/2021. Service made by ECF, Email. SEND TO MERITS PANEL. [21-2492]--[Edited 08/23/2021 by JK] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (RESTREPO, Circuit Judges) The emergency motion for a temporary stay is DENIED. If the appellants want an injunction pending this appeal, they may file a motion requesting that relief within five days of this order. Any response must be filed within seven days of the motion. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 27.7. The motion will thereafter be submitted to a panel of this Court for consideration in due course.. Panel No.: ECO-032-E. RESTREPO, Authoring Judge. (JK) [Entered: 08/10/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Smith & Wesson Brands Inc. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Smith & Wesson Inc. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Smith & Wesson Sales Co. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, Smith & Wesson Inc and Smith & Wesson Sales Co to stay Emergency Temporary Stay. Certificate of Service dated 08/10/2021. Service made by ECF, Email. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Courtney G. Saleski on behalf of Appellant(s) Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Smith & Wesson Sales Company, and Smith & Wesson Inc.. [21-2492] (CGS) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. McGuire, DAG on behalf of Appellee(s) New Jersey Acting Attorney General Andrew J. Bruck and New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs. [21-2492] (RJM) [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 08/10/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Smith & Wesson Brands Inc, Smith & Wesson Inc and Smith & Wesson Sales Co in District Court No. 2-20-cv-19047. (JK) [Entered: 08/10/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH & WESSON CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. McGuire Esq.