This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/05/2020 at 06:09:55 (UTC).

Smith v. State of Oklahoma, et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against State of Oklahoma. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6115

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

OKLAHOMA COUNTY DETENTION CENTER

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

FNU RIOS

FNU CAMPBELL, individually and in official capacity, Detention Officer

OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

FNU TEXAS, individually and in official capacity, Detention Officer

FNU LAMB, individually and in official capacity, Detention Officer

Plaintiff / Appellant

NICOIS M. SMITH

Spencer, OK 73084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Nicois M. Smith

9221 Ne 45Th

Spencer, OK 73084

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10771020] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1 - pleadings. [20-6115] [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:21 AM]

Open Document

[10770903] Jurisdictional review complete. Notice of appearance, brief and fee or 1915 forms due 10/26/2020 for Nicois M. Smith. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/07/2020 [20-6115] [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:41 PM]

Open Document

[10770899] District court order denying 1915(b) motion. [20-6115] [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:38 PM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter and preliminary record

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771020] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1 - pleadings. [20-6115] [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10770903] Jurisdictional review complete. Notice of appearance, brief and fee or 1915 forms due 10/26/2020 for Nicois M. Smith. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/07/2020 [20-6115] [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10770899] District court order denying 1915(b) motion. [20-6115] [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10760934] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/06/2020. Notice of appearance due on 09/08/2020 for Nicois M. Smith. Order on pending 1915 motion due 09/08/2020. [20-6115] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oklahoma County Detention Center is a litigant

Latest cases where OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant