Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 06:28:47 (UTC).

Small v. Joyce

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Small filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Joyce. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2066

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

IYASSU TAFORI SMALL

Machias, ME 04654

Respondent / Appellee

KEVIN J. JOYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Iyassu Tafori Small

Attorney at Washington County Jail

83 Court St

Machias, ME 04654

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Donald W. Macomber

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Electronic order dated 12/18/20 granting in forma pauperis status while on appeal.. [20-2066] (DPO) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:10 PM]

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 23 (Electronic Order entered on December 18, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Nivison granting [22] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal). [20-2066] (GAK) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:27 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin J. Joyce filed by Attorney Donald W. Macomber, AAG, Maine OAG. Certificate of service dated 11/17/2020. [20-2066] (DWM) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:48 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Electronic order dated 12/18/20 granting in forma pauperis status while on appeal.. [20-2066] (DPO) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRequest to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Iyassu Tafori Small was granted in the district court by order dated 12/18/2020. [20-2066] (GAK) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 23 (Electronic Order entered on December 18, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Nivison granting [22] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal). [20-2066] (GAK) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin J. Joyce filed by Attorney Donald W. Macomber, AAG, Maine OAG. Certificate of service dated 11/17/2020. [20-2066] (DWM) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #16) filed by Appellant Iyassu Tafori Small. Fee due 11/30/2020.. [20-2066] (CMP) [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD W. MACOMBER