This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2021 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

Sling TV, L.L.C. v. Uniloc 2017 LLC

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Sling TV, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Uniloc 2017 LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1651

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

SLING TV, L.L.C.

Appellee

UNILOC 2017 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Eliot Damon Williams

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Appellee Attorney

Ryan S. Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Boulevard, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/11/2021. [755823] Entry of Appearance is due on 02/26/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/26/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 02/26/2021. Certified List is due on 03/24/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sling TV L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant